EP2304634 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING DRILLING ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For:BG
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
NO
PL
RO
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
EE
ES
FI
HR
IS
LI
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
PT
SE
SM
PRAD Research And Development Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | [N/P] |
Former [2011/14] | For:BG
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
NO
PL
RO
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | ||
For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town Tortola / VG | |||
For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | |||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
EE
ES
FI
HR
IS
LI
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
PT
SE
SM
PRAD Research And Development Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARROW, Harry "Willow Corner" 2 Cockerton Road Girton Cambridgeshire CB3 0QW / GB | 02 /
DU CASTEL, Bertrand 50 Pascal Lane Austin TX 78746 / US | [2011/14] | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department Parkstraat 83 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/14] | Ford, Michael Frederick Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 09800132.4 | 23.07.2009 | [2011/14] | WO2009IB06346 | Priority number, date | US20080083125P | 23.07.2008 Original published format: US 83125 P | US20080083074P | 23.07.2008 Original published format: US 83074 P | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010010453 | Date: | 28.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2304634 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06N7/00, G06F19/00, // G06N5/02 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
G06N5/022 (EP,US);
G06N7/01 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/14] | G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/14] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER BOHRAKTIVITÄT | [2011/14] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING DRILLING ACTIVITY | [2011/14] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D' ACTIVITÉ DE FORAGE | [2011/14] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 28.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 02.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 27.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004124012 (DUNLOP JONATHAN [GB], et al) [I] 1-3,10-12 * the whole document *; | [L]EP2304172 (SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY BV [NL], et al) [L] 1-3,10-12 * Guidelines B-X, 9.2.8(c) *; | [I] - F. CAMCI, R. B. CHINNAM, "Hierarchical HMMs for autonomous diagnostics and prognostics", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2006 IEEE INTERNATIONAL JOINT CONFERENCE ON NEURAL NETWORKS (IJCNN'06), (20060716), doi:10.1109/IJCNN.2006.1716422, pages 2445 - 2452, XP010948807 [I] 1-3,10-12 * abstract and sections III-V * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IJCNN.2006.1716422 | [I] - W. ROEDDER, E. REUCHER, F. KULMANN, "Features of the expert-system-shell SPIRIT", LOGIC JOURNAL OF THE IGPL, (20060902), vol. 14, no. 3, doi:10.1093/jigpal/jzl020, pages 483 - 500, XP008174260 [I] 1-3,10-12 * sections 2.4.2, 3 and 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jigpal/jzl020 | [I] - K. B. LASKEY, "MEBN: a language for first-order Bayesian knowledge bases", ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE, (20071004), vol. 172, no. 2-3, doi:10.1016/J.ARTINT.2007.09.006, pages 140 - 178, XP022392582 [I] 1-3,10-12 * abstract and sections 3-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.artint.2007.09.006 | [I] - Y. YANG, J. CALMET, "From the OntoBayes model to a service oriented decision support system", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2006 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTATIONAL INTELLIGENCE FOR MODELLING, CONTROL AND AUTOMATION, AND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT AGENTS, WEB TECHNOLOGIES AND INTERNET COMMERCE (CIMCA-IAWTIC'06), (20061128), doi:10.1109/CIMCA.2006.102, XP031002763 [I] 1-3,10-12 * abstract, sections 1, 3, 5 and 6 * | [I] - C. WANG, T.-Y. LEONG, "Knowledge-based formulation of dynamic decision models", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, (19981122), vol. 1531, doi:10.1007/BFb0095296, pages 506 - 517, XP055163198 [I] 1-3,10-12 * sections 4, 5.2 and 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BFb0095296 | International search | [A]US6892812 (NIEDERMAYR MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US7128167 (DUNLOP JONATHAN [GB], et al); | [X] - PETER HAASE ET AL., "Ontology Learning and Reasoning-Dealing with Uncertainty and Inconsistency", International Semantic Web Conference, Galway, Ireland, 2005., pages 45 - 55, XP019112762 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-89765-1_21 | [Y] - ZHANG ZHANG ET AL., "Complex Activity Representation and Recognition by Extended Stochastic Grammar", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, HEIDELBERG, (2006), vol. 3851, pages 150 - 159, XP019027341 | [T] - LYMBEROPOULOS, D ET AL., "Macroscopic Human Behavior Interpretation Using Distributed Imager and Other Sensors", PROCEEDINGS IF THE IEEE, (200810), pages 1657 - 1677, XP011237281 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPROC.2008.928761 |