EP2317922 - BODY FLUID SAMPLING DEVICE WITH A CAPACITIVE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2017/50] |
Former [2014/02] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [2013/28] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Industriepark Hoechst Building K607 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states Pelikan Technologies Inc. 1072 East Meadow Circle Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREEMAN, Dominique, M. 4545 La Honda Road La Honda CA 94020 / US | 02 /
ALDEN, Don 1312 Nelson Way Sunnyvale CA 94087 / US | 03 /
BRIGGS, Barry, Dean 2070 Anthony Drive Campbell CA 95008 / US | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | McDougall, James Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2017/50] |
Former [2013/32] | Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | ||
Former [2013/28] | Hodsdon, Stephen James Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2012/02] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2011/19] | Lewis, Darren John D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 09800968.1 | 22.07.2009 | [2011/19] | WO2009US51455 | Priority number, date | US20080179775 | 25.07.2008 Original published format: US 179775 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010011786 | Date: | 28.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2317922 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2317922 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/42, A61M5/46, A61B5/15, A61B5/151, A61B5/157 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
A61B5/15126 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150061 (EP,US);
A61B5/150068 (EP,US);
A61B5/150099 (EP,US);
A61B5/150152 (EP,US);
A61B5/150167 (EP,US);
A61B5/150175 (EP,US);
A61B5/15019 (EP,US);
A61B5/150358 (EP,US);
A61B5/150427 (EP,US);
A61B5/150503 (EP,US);
A61B5/150572 (EP,US);
A61B5/150748 (EP,US);
A61B5/15113 (EP,US);
A61B5/15115 (EP,US);
A61B5/15117 (EP,US);
A61B5/15123 (EP,US);
A61B5/15146 (EP,US);
A61B5/15153 (EP,US);
A61B5/15169 (EP,US);
A61B5/15171 (EP,US);
A61B5/15174 (EP,US);
A61B5/15176 (EP,US);
A61B5/15178 (EP,US);
A61B5/15184 (EP,US);
A61B5/15186 (EP,US);
A61B5/157 (EP,US);
A61M5/427 (US);
A61M5/46 (US);
A61B5/1411 (US);
A61B5/150106 (US);
A61B5/15109 (US);
|
Former IPC [2011/19] | A61B5/151 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] |
Former [2011/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG MIT KAPAZITIVEM SENSOR ZUR ENTNAHME VON KÖRPERFLÜSSIGKEITSPROBEN | [2011/19] | English: | BODY FLUID SAMPLING DEVICE WITH A CAPACITIVE SENSOR | [2011/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCHANTILLONNAGE DE LIQUIDE ORGANIQUE AVEC CAPTEUR CAPACITIF | [2011/19] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 12.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.01.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 29.09.2011 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2011/47] | 03.06.2013 | Resumption of proceedings | [2013/17] | 29.09.2011 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2013/17] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2009 | AT | 13.12.2017 | CY | 13.12.2017 | CZ | 13.12.2017 | DK | 13.12.2017 | EE | 13.12.2017 | ES | 13.12.2017 | FI | 13.12.2017 | HR | 13.12.2017 | IT | 13.12.2017 | LT | 13.12.2017 | LV | 13.12.2017 | MC | 13.12.2017 | MK | 13.12.2017 | NL | 13.12.2017 | PL | 13.12.2017 | PT | 13.12.2017 | RO | 13.12.2017 | SE | 13.12.2017 | SI | 13.12.2017 | SK | 13.12.2017 | SM | 13.12.2017 | TR | 13.12.2017 | BG | 13.03.2018 | NO | 13.03.2018 | GR | 14.03.2018 | IS | 13.04.2018 | GB | 22.07.2018 | IE | 22.07.2018 | LU | 22.07.2018 | MT | 22.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | FR | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 22.07.2009 | |
AT | 13.12.2017 | ||
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
GB | 22.07.2018 | ||
IE | 22.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
MT | 22.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
GB | 22.07.2018 | ||
IE | 22.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
MT | 22.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
GB | 22.07.2018 | ||
IE | 22.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
MT | 22.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
GB | 22.07.2018 | ||
IE | 22.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
GB | 22.07.2018 | ||
IE | 22.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 22.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002058953 (GRUZDEV VALENTIN A [RU] ET AL) [X] 1,3,4,13,15 * paragraphs [0054] , [0055] , [0059] , [0060] , [0081] * * pages 1,2A,4 * [I] 8-12; | [XI]WO2007088905 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]; AMANO YOSHINORI; FUJIWARA MASAKI) [X] 1,3,4,13,15 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0038] , [0039] * [I] 9-12; | [XI]WO2007054335 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]; ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE]; CALASSO IRIO GIUS) [X] 1,3-5,13 * page 7, line 29 - page 11, line 25 * * figures 1,6,8a,8b * [I] 9-12,14,15; | [A]WO2007042137 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE]; HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]; LIST HANS [DE]; H) [A] 1,13 * page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 13 * * figures 5-7 * | International search | [X]US2006100542 (WONG ET AL); | [Y]US2008047764 (LEE ET AL); | [A]US2007142748 (DESHMUKH ET AL); | [A]US2003136189 (LAUMAN ET AL); | [A]US4661768 (CARUSILLO) | Examination | EP1446176 | by applicant | - Electrical Engineering Handbook, (1997), pages 1472 - 1474 |