EP2310400 - METHODS FOR EXTRACTING AND PURIFYING SUCRALOSE INTERMEDIATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mamtek International Limited 27/F Hopewell Center 183 Queens Road East Hong Kong / CN | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HO, David, Losan 1101 Glenville Drive Los Angeles CA 90035 / US | 02 /
WAN, Zhenghao Middle Section Wuyi Blvd. Fujian Wyuishan City / CN | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Kennedydamm 55/Roßstr. 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09801025.9 | 23.07.2009 | [2011/16] | WO2009US51588 | Priority number, date | US20080178510 | 23.07.2008 Original published format: US 178510 | [2011/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010011866 | Date: | 28.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2310400 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07H1/06, C07H3/00, C07H1/00 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
C07H13/04 (EP,US);
C07H3/00 (KR);
C07H1/00 (KR);
C07H1/06 (KR);
C07H13/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR EXTRAKTION UND REINIGUNG EINES SUCRALOSEZWISCHEPRODUKTS | [2011/16] | English: | METHODS FOR EXTRACTING AND PURIFYING SUCRALOSE INTERMEDIATE | [2011/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D EXTRACTION ET DE PURIFICATION D UN INTERMÉDIAIRE DU SUCRALOSE | [2011/16] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/31] | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.08.2011 | 31.07.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006117799 (PHARMED MEDICARE PVT LTD [IN], et al)[A] 1-9; | [A]WO2007052304 (PHARMED MEDICARE PTY LTD [IN], et al) [A] 1-9 * example 1; claim 5 *; | [A]WO2008084498 (PHARMED MEDICARE PVT LTD [IN], et al) [A] 1-9 | International search | [Y]US4977254 (HOMER NIGEL J [GB], et al); | [Y]US2003171575 (CATANI STEVEN J [US], et al); | [Y]US2006205936 (JIA LIZHU [US], et al); | [X]US2008103295 (HO DAVID LOSAN [US], et al) |