EP2510368 - MAGNETIC STEERING APPLICATION FOR SINGULATED (X)MR SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2012/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESHOLD, Jochen c/o NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing Department High Tech Campus 32 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
HOLTZ, Tom c/o NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing Department High Tech Campus 32 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
BASILE, Giovanni c/o NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing Department High Tech Campus 32 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
HEIDRICH, Oliver c/o NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing Department High Tech Campus 32 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / DE | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Schwarzweller, Thomas, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing Stresemannallee 101 22529 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Schwarzweller, Thomas, et al NXP Semiconductors Germany GmbH Intellectual Property & Licensing Department Stresemannallee 101 22529 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09801268.5 | 08.12.2009 | WO2009IB55567 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011070394 | Date: | 16.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2510368 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/315, G01R31/28, G01R33/09 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
G01R31/315 (EP,US);
G01R31/2829 (EP,US);
G01R31/2863 (EP,US);
G01R33/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Title | German: | MAGNETLENKANORDNUNG FÜR VEREINZELTE (X)MR-SENSOREN | [2012/42] | English: | MAGNETIC STEERING APPLICATION FOR SINGULATED (X)MR SENSORS | [2012/42] | French: | APPLICATION DE GUIDAGE MAGNÉTIQUE POUR CAPTEURS (X)MR SÉPARÉS | [2012/42] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 18.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/49] | 29.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2006049823 (SUZUKI TAKASHI [JP]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0119]; figures 17,18 *; | [I]US2006284629 (WEI CHENG P [US], et al) [I] 1,13,17 * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0105]; figure 14 *; | [A]US7183763 (MURATA HISANORI [JP]) [A] 1,13,17 * abstract *; | [Y]US2007063721 (DOZIER THOMAS H II [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-3 *; | [XI] - Multitest, "InStrip®Test Handling System - Factsheet", (200711), URL: http://www.multitest.com/media/media0092220.PDF, (20100816), XP002597064 [X] 1,13,17 * the whole document * [I] 2-12,14-16,18-20 | [A] - "Multitest MEMS Test Solutions - Product flyer", (200506), Multitest, URL: http://www.multitest.com/media/media0089520.PDF, (20100816), XP002597065 [A] 1,13,17 * the whole document * |