EP2389509 - STATIONARY ENERGY PRODUCTION PLANT HAVING A BRAKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCHTALA, Boris Lindachstrasse 38 75417 Muehlacker / DE | 02 /
BERGER, Günter Strassburger Allee 1a 44577 Catrop-Rauxel / DE | 03 /
SCHNURR, Bernd Frühlingstrasse 11 97816 Lohr-Sendelbach / DE | [2011/48] | Representative(s) | Thürer, Andreas Bosch Rexroth AG BR/IPR Zum Eisengiesser 1 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | Thürer, Andreas Bosch Rexroth AG DC/IPR Zum Eisengießer 1 97816 Lohr / DE | Application number, filing date | 09801411.1 | 19.12.2009 | WO2009EP09164 | Priority number, date | DE20091006054 | 24.01.2009 Original published format: DE102009006054 | [2011/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010083866 | Date: | 29.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2389509 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2389509 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/04, F03D7/02 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
F03D7/042 (EP);
F03D7/0248 (EP);
F05B2260/904 (EP);
F05B2270/1011 (EP);
F05B2270/1016 (EP);
F05B2270/1032 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2011/48] | F03D7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Title | German: | STATIONÄRE ENERGIEGEWINNUNGSANLAGE MIT EINER ABBREMSVORRICHTUNG | [2011/48] | English: | STATIONARY ENERGY PRODUCTION PLANT HAVING A BRAKING DEVICE | [2011/48] | French: | INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION D'ENERGIE STATIONNAIRE DOTEE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE FREINAGE | [2012/31] |
Former [2011/48] | INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE STATIONNAIRE DOTÉE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE FREINAGE | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 12.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2009 | CY | 22.08.2012 | EE | 22.08.2012 | HR | 22.08.2012 | IT | 22.08.2012 | LT | 22.08.2012 | LV | 22.08.2012 | MK | 22.08.2012 | MT | 22.08.2012 | NL | 22.08.2012 | PL | 22.08.2012 | RO | 22.08.2012 | SE | 22.08.2012 | SI | 22.08.2012 | SM | 22.08.2012 | TR | 22.08.2012 | BG | 22.11.2012 | NO | 22.11.2012 | GR | 23.11.2012 | IE | 19.12.2012 | LU | 19.12.2012 | IS | 22.12.2012 | PT | 24.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | FR | 02.01.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 19.12.2009 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SM | 22.08.2012 | ||
TR | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IE | 19.12.2012 | ||
LU | 19.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SM | 22.08.2012 | ||
TR | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IE | 19.12.2012 | ||
LU | 19.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
TR | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IE | 19.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IE | 19.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | EE | 22.08.2012 | |
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IE | 19.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | EE | 22.08.2012 | |
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IE | 19.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | EE | 22.08.2012 | |
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IE | 19.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | EE | 22.08.2012 | |
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | EE | 22.08.2012 | |
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | EE | 22.08.2012 | |
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | EE | 22.08.2012 | |
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | HR | 22.08.2012 | |
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | HR | 22.08.2012 | |
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | HR | 22.08.2012 | |
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | HR | 22.08.2012 | |
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | HR | 22.08.2012 | |
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 22.08.2012 | |
NO | 22.11.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US6254197 (LADING PER [DK], et al) [X] 1,5,8 * column 1, line 7 - line 17 * * column 2, line 15 * * column 9, line 30 - line 39 * * column 11, line 19 - line 56 * * column 13, line 4 - line 56; figures 4,6-11 * [A] 2,14 [I] 9-13; | [A]GB2206930 (LAWSON TANCRED H SONS & CO SIR) [A] 1,14 * page 8, line 16 - page 9, line 15 * * page 14, line 10 - line 18 *; | [A]DE10153798 (HENNCHEN NORBERT [DE]) [A] 1,14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0024] * | by applicant | US6254197 |