EP2376160 - AUTOMATIC RISE TIME ADJUSTMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/25] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2011/42] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUFF, Winslow, Kevin P.O. Box 3001 345 Scarborough Road Briarcliff Manor, New York 10510-8001 / US | 02 /
HILL, Peter, D. P.O. Box 3001 345 Scarborough Road Briarcliff Manor, New York 10510-8001 / US | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/25] |
Former [2011/42] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09801778.3 | 21.11.2009 | [2016/25] | WO2009IB55248 | Priority number, date | US20080120955P | 09.12.2008 Original published format: US 120955 P | [2011/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010067236 | Date: | 17.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2376160 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2376160 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
A61M16/0066 (EP,US);
A61M16/0051 (US);
A61M16/0069 (EP,US);
A61M16/024 (EP,US);
A61M16/161 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0021 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0027 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0039 (EP,US);
A61M2205/502 (EP,US);
A61M2230/432 (EP,US);
A61M2230/50 (EP,US);
A61M2230/60 (EP,US);
A61M2230/65 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE ANSTIEGSZEITVERSTELLUNG | [2011/42] | English: | AUTOMATIC RISE TIME ADJUSTMENT | [2011/42] | French: | AJUSTEMENT AUTOMATIQUE DE LA DURÉE D'AUGMENTATION | [2011/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 26.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.11.2009 | AT | 22.06.2016 | BE | 22.06.2016 | BG | 22.06.2016 | CY | 22.06.2016 | CZ | 22.06.2016 | DK | 22.06.2016 | EE | 22.06.2016 | ES | 22.06.2016 | FI | 22.06.2016 | HR | 22.06.2016 | IT | 22.06.2016 | LT | 22.06.2016 | LV | 22.06.2016 | MC | 22.06.2016 | MK | 22.06.2016 | NL | 22.06.2016 | PL | 22.06.2016 | RO | 22.06.2016 | SE | 22.06.2016 | SI | 22.06.2016 | SK | 22.06.2016 | SM | 22.06.2016 | TR | 22.06.2016 | NO | 22.09.2016 | GR | 23.09.2016 | IS | 22.10.2016 | PT | 24.10.2016 | GB | 21.11.2016 | IE | 21.11.2016 | MT | 21.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 21.11.2009 | |
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
BG | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MK | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
TR | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
GB | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 21.11.2009 | |
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MK | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
TR | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
GB | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.11.2009 | |
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MK | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
GB | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
GB | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 22.06.2016 | |
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 22.06.2016 | |
NO | 22.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XDA]US5598838 (SERVIDIO JOHN L [US], et al) [XD] 1-3 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 50 * * column 4, line 50 - column 22, line 5 *[A] 4-11; | [XA]US6305372 (SERVIDIO JOHN L [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 35 * * column 4, line 45 - column 6, line 10 * * column 17, line 42 - column 18, line 50 * * column 21, line 57 - column 22, line 9 * [A] 4-11; | [XDY]US6532960 (YURKO GREGORY [US]) [XD] 1-3,6,10 * column 2, lines 10-55 * * column 3, line 9 - column 10, line 36 * [Y] 4-5,7-9,11; | [XYI]US2006070624 (KANE MICHAEL T [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10-11 * paragraphs [0017] - [0019] - [0040] - [0068] - [0075] - [0086] * * paragraphs [0121] - [0127] - [0132] - [0142] * [Y] 4-5,7-9,11 [I] 7-8 | by applicant | US5148802 | US5239995 | US5313937 | US5433193 | US5535738 | US5794615 | US6105575 | US6532960 | US6640806 | US2006070624 |