EP2517201 - SPARSE AUDIO PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/44] | SPARSE AUDIO | ||
[2015/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OJALA, Pasi Neidonkalliontie 9 FIN-02400 Kirkkonummi / FI | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2015/45] | Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2012/44] | Jaatinen, Jussi Imari Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 09802147.0 | 23.12.2009 | [2015/45] | WO2009EP67903 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011076285 | Date: | 30.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2517201 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2517201 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/008, G10L19/02 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
G10L19/02 (EP,US);
G10L19/008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/44] | G10L19/02, H03M7/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPARSE AUDIOVERARBEITUNG | [2015/28] | English: | SPARSE AUDIO PROCESSING | [2015/28] | French: | TRAITEMENT AUDIO PARCIMONIEUX | [2015/28] |
Former [2012/44] | LÜCKENHAFTES AUDIOSIGNAL | ||
Former [2012/44] | SPARSE AUDIO | ||
Former [2012/44] | SIGNAL AUDIO ÉPARS | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 24.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2009 | AT | 04.11.2015 | BE | 04.11.2015 | BG | 04.11.2015 | CY | 04.11.2015 | CZ | 04.11.2015 | DK | 04.11.2015 | EE | 04.11.2015 | ES | 04.11.2015 | FI | 04.11.2015 | HR | 04.11.2015 | IT | 04.11.2015 | LT | 04.11.2015 | LV | 04.11.2015 | MC | 04.11.2015 | MK | 04.11.2015 | MT | 04.11.2015 | NL | 04.11.2015 | PL | 04.11.2015 | RO | 04.11.2015 | SE | 04.11.2015 | SI | 04.11.2015 | SK | 04.11.2015 | SM | 04.11.2015 | TR | 04.11.2015 | IE | 23.12.2015 | LU | 23.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | FR | 04.01.2016 | NO | 04.02.2016 | GR | 05.02.2016 | IS | 04.03.2016 | PT | 04.03.2016 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 23.12.2009 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
BG | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
LU | 23.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 04.01.2016 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 23.12.2009 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
BG | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 04.01.2016 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 04.01.2016 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 04.01.2016 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
LT | 04.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XAYI] - GRIFFIN ET AL, "Compressed Sensing of Audio Signals Using Multiple Sensors", PROCEEDINGS 16TH EUROPEAN SIGNAL PROCESSING CONFERENCE (EUSIPCO 2008), AUGUST 25-29, 2008, Lausanne, Switzerland, (20080827), XP002584325 [X] 1-6,17,24,42 * abstract * * section 2. Compressed sensing * [A] 25-40 [Y] 7-10,19,41 [I] 11-16,18,20-23 | [XAYI] - GRIFFIN A ET AL, "Encoding the sinusoidal model of an audio signal using compressed sensing", MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO, 2009. ICME 2009. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090628), ISBN 978-1-4244-4290-4, pages 153 - 156, XP031510715 [X] 1-6,17,24,42 * abstract * * p. 154, section 3. Compressed sensing. * [A] 25-40 [Y] 7-10,19,41 [I] 11-16,18,20-23 | [XAY] - BAUMGARTE F ET AL, "Binaural cue coding-part II: schemes and applications", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SPEECH AND AUDIO PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/TSA.2003.818109, (20031101), vol. 11, no. 6, ISSN 1063-6676, pages 520 - 531, XP011104739 [X] 25-31,39,40 * abstract * * section II. BCC Synthesis * * section III. Binaural Cue Coding Schemes * [A] 1-24,32-38,42 [Y] 41 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TSA.2003.818108 | [XAYI] - CANDES E J ET AL, "An Introduction ToCompressive Sampling", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/MSP.2007.914731, (20080321), vol. 25, no. 2, ISSN 1053-5888, pages 21 - 30, XP002562787 [X] 1-6,17,24,42 * the whole document * [A] 25-40 [Y] 41 [I] 7-16,18-23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MSP.2007.914731 | [YA] - MESECHER D ET AL, "Exploiting signal sparseness for reduced-rate sampling", SYSTEMS, APPLICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2009. LISAT '09. IEEE LONG ISLAND, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090501), ISBN 978-1-4244-2347-7, pages 1 - 6, XP031467344 [Y] 7-10,19 * the whole document * [A] 1-6,11-18,20-42 | [YA] - LIEBCHEN T, "Lossless Audio Coding using Adaptive Multichannel Prediction", PROCEEDINGS AES 113TH CONVENTION, Los Angeles, USA, (20021005), XP002466533 [Y] 7-10,19 * the whole document * [A] 1-6,11-18,20-42 |