EP2520059 - PERFORMING A TIME MEASUREMENT IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telecom Italia S.p.A. Via Gaetano Negri, 1 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/51] | For all designated states Telecom Italia S.p.A. Via Gaetano Negri, 1 20123 Milan / IT | ||
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states Telecom Italia S.p.A. Piazza degli Affari 2 20123 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COCIGLIO, Mauro Telecom Italia S.p.a. Via G. Reiss Romoli 274 I-10148 Torino / IT | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | Colombo, Stefano Paolo, et al Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Vittor Pisani, 13 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | Colombo, Stefano Paolo, et al MARCHI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via G.B. Pirelli, 19 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 09802148.8 | 29.12.2009 | WO2009EP67991 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011079857 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2520059 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2520059 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/26 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
H04L43/106 (EP,KR,US);
H04L65/762 (EP,US);
H04L43/0858 (EP,KR,US);
H04L43/087 (EP,KR,US);
H04L65/4053 (EP,US);
H04L65/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCHFÜHRUNG VON ZEITMESSUNG IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | [2014/34] | English: | PERFORMING A TIME MEASUREMENT IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2012/45] | French: | RÉALISATION DE MESURE DE TEMPS DANS UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION | [2014/34] |
Former [2012/45] | ZEITMESSUNG IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | ||
Former [2012/45] | RÉALISATION D'UNE MESURE DE TEMPS DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 04.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.12.2009 | AT | 19.11.2014 | BG | 19.11.2014 | CY | 19.11.2014 | CZ | 19.11.2014 | DK | 19.11.2014 | EE | 19.11.2014 | ES | 19.11.2014 | HR | 19.11.2014 | LT | 19.11.2014 | LV | 19.11.2014 | MC | 19.11.2014 | MK | 19.11.2014 | MT | 19.11.2014 | PL | 19.11.2014 | RO | 19.11.2014 | SI | 19.11.2014 | SK | 19.11.2014 | SM | 19.11.2014 | TR | 19.11.2014 | IE | 29.12.2014 | LU | 29.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | NO | 19.02.2015 | GR | 20.02.2015 | IS | 19.03.2015 | PT | 19.03.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 29.12.2009 | |
AT | 19.11.2014 | ||
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
SM | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 29.12.2014 | ||
LU | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 29.12.2009 | |
AT | 19.11.2014 | ||
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
SM | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
SM | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
SM | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 19.11.2014 | |
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 19.11.2014 | |
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 19.11.2014 | |
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 19.11.2014 | |
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 19.11.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1130850 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1-2 *; | [A] - BIANCHETTI G PICCIANO TELECOM ITALIA M CHEN J QIU HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO M ET AL, Requirements for IP multicast performance monitoring; draft-bipi-mboned-ip-multicast-pm-requirement-00.txt, REQUIREMENTS FOR IP MULTICAST PERFORMANCE MONITORING; DRAFT-BIPI-MBONED-IP-MULTICAST-PM-REQUIREMENT-00.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20090706), XP015063050 [A] 1-15 * page 1 - page 12 * |