EP2356991 - USE OF BACTERIA OF THE GENUS TENACIBACULUM FOR QUORUM QUENCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universidade de Santiago de Compostela Reitorado da Universidade de Santiago de Compostela Colexio de San Xerome Pza. do Obradoiro, s/n 15782 Santiago de Compostela, A Coruña / ES | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/20] | For all designated states Universidad de Santiago de Compostela Edificio CACTUS-CITT Campus Sur 15782 Santiago de Compostela (A Coruña) / ES | ||
Former [2011/33] | For all designated states Universidad De Santiago De Compostela Edif. CACTUS-CITT Campus Sur 15782 Santiago De Compostela / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTERO CASAL, Ana María Universidade de Santiago de Compostela Edificio CACTUS-CITT Campus Sur E-15782 Santiago de Compostela (A Coruña) / ES | 02 /
ROMERO BERNÁRDEZ, Manuel Universidade de Santiago de Compostela Edificio CACTUS-CITT Campus Sur E-15782 Santiago de Compostela (A Coruña) / ES | 03 /
ROCA RIVADA, Arturo Universidade de Santiago de Compostela Edificio CACTUS-CITT Campus Sur E-15782 Santiago de Compostela (A Coruña) / ES | [2015/22] |
Former [2011/33] | 01 /
OTERO CASAL, Ana María Edificio CACTUS-CITT Campus Sur E-15782 Santiago de Compostela (A Coruña) / ES | ||
02 /
ROMERO BERNÁRDEZ, Manuel Universidade de Santiago de Compostela Edificio CACTUS-CITT Campus Sur E-15782 Santiago de Compostela (A Coruña) / ES | |||
03 /
ROCA RIVADA, Arturo Universidade de Santiago de Compostela Edificio CACTUS-CITT Campus Sur E-15782 Santiago de Compostela (A Coruña) / ES | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2012/37] | Pons Ariño, Angel, et al Pons Patentes y Marcas Internacional, S.L. Glorieta Ruben Dario, 4 28010 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2011/33] | Pons Ariño, Maria Purificación Gl. Rubén Darío 4 E-28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 09802538.0 | 23.07.2009 | [2011/33] | WO2009ES70306 | Priority number, date | ES20080002309 | 01.08.2008 Original published format: ES 200802309 | [2011/33] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010012852 | Date: | 04.02.2010 | Language: | ES | [2010/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2356991 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2356991 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 04.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/74, A61P31/04, C12N1/20, C12R1/01 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
A61K35/74 (EP,ES,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C12N1/20 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
C12R2001/01 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/33] | A61K35/74, A61P31/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] |
Former [2011/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON BAKTERIEN DER GATTUNG TENACIBACULUM FÜR QUORUM-QUENCHING | [2011/33] | English: | USE OF BACTERIA OF THE GENUS TENACIBACULUM FOR QUORUM QUENCHING | [2011/33] | French: | UTILISATION DE BACTERIES DU GENRE TENACIBACULUM POUR OBTENIR UN QUORUM QUENCHING | [2015/22] |
Former [2011/33] | UTILISATION DE BACTÉRIES DU GENRE TENACIBACULUM POUR OBTENIR UN QUORUM QUENCHING | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2011 | Translation filed | 24.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 30.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.07.2009 | AT | 14.10.2015 | BE | 14.10.2015 | BG | 14.10.2015 | CY | 14.10.2015 | CZ | 14.10.2015 | EE | 14.10.2015 | ES | 14.10.2015 | FI | 14.10.2015 | HR | 14.10.2015 | LT | 14.10.2015 | LV | 14.10.2015 | MC | 14.10.2015 | MK | 14.10.2015 | NL | 14.10.2015 | PL | 14.10.2015 | PT | 14.10.2015 | RO | 14.10.2015 | SE | 14.10.2015 | SI | 14.10.2015 | SK | 14.10.2015 | SM | 14.10.2015 | TR | 14.10.2015 | NO | 14.01.2016 | IS | 14.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 23.07.2009 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PT | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 23.07.2009 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 23.07.2009 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2001136961 (MARINE BIOTECH INST CO LTD); | [XA]JP2008074797 (UNIV KINKI); | International search | [A]WO03075654 (UNIV NOTTINGHAM [GB], et al); | [A]WO2008069374 (SEOUL NAT UNIV IND FOUNDATION [KR], et al); |