EP2323421 - MICROPHONE UNIT AND CELLULAR PHONE PROVIDED WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Onpa Technologies Inc. 303 Terry Fox Drive, Suite 300 Ottawa, ON K2K 3J1 / CA | [2015/42] |
Former [2015/23] | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | ||
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | ||
For all designated states Funai Electric Advanced Applied Technology Research Institute Inc. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INODA, Takeshi c/o FUNAI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 7-1 Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | 02 /
HORIBE, Ryusuke c/o FUNAI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 7-1 Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Fuminori c/o FUNAI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 7-1 Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | 04 /
TAKANO, Rikuo c/o FUNAI ELECTRIC ADVANCED APPLIED TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH INSTITUTE INC. 7-1 Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | 05 /
SUGIYAMA, Kiyoshi 7-3-27 Mure Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181-0002 / JP | 06 /
FUKUOKA, Toshimi Kibogaoka Dai-2 Koporasu C-119 144-1 Nakakibogaoka Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 241-0825 / JP | 07 /
ONO, Masatoshi 1280 Uenomuro Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0023 / JP | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09802846.7 | 16.07.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009JP62904 | Priority number, date | JP20080196540 | 30.07.2008 Original published format: JP 2008196540 | [2011/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010013603 | Date: | 04.02.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2323421 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/38, H04M1/03 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
H04R1/38 (EP,US);
H04M1/035 (EP,US);
H04R2499/11 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/20] | H04R1/28, H04R1/02, H04R1/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | MIKROFONEINHEIT UND MOBILTELEFON DAMIT | [2011/20] | English: | MICROPHONE UNIT AND CELLULAR PHONE PROVIDED WITH SAME | [2011/20] | French: | MICROPHONE, ET TÉLÉPHONE CELLULAIRE EN ÉTANT MUNI | [2011/20] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2011 | Translation filed | 25.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 16.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 19.05.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/32] | 21.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/32] | Appeal following examination | 28.07.2015 | Appeal received No. T2074/15 | 28.09.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.06.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5511130 (BARTLETT CHARLES S [US], et al) [Y] 2-4 * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 31 ** figure 1 *; | [X]EP1505853 (KNOWLES ELECTRONICS LLC [US]) [X] 1,6 * paragraphs [0018] - [0022] * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2005069164 (MUTHUSWAMY SIVAKUMAR [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8,10 * paragraphs [0012] - [0013] * * figure 1 *; | [X]US2005207605 (DEHE ALFONS [DE], et al) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0046] - [0047] - [0052] * * page 1; figure 1 *; | [XY]US2008130935 (SATO AKIYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-7,9 * paragraphs [0052] , [0055] , [0059] - [0060] * * figure 1 * [Y] 2-4 | International search | [Y]JPH07307990 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH); | [X]JP2005295278 (HOSIDEN CORP); | [Y]JP2008109649 (YAMAHA CORP) | by applicant | JPH06339192 | JPH0898289 | JP2001054195 | JP2003163996 | JP2007060228 |