EP2330234 - SILICON SINGLE CRYSTAL PULL-UP APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumco Techxiv Corporation 1324-2, Masuragahara-machi Omura-shi, Nagasaki 856-8555 / JP | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NARUSHIMA, Yasuhito c/o SUMCO TECHXIV CORPORATION 1324-2 Masuragahara-machi Omura-shi Nagasaki 856-8555 / JP | 02 /
KAWAZOE, Shinichi c/o SUMCO TECHXIV CORPORATION 1324-2 Masuragahara-machi Omura-shi Nagasaki 856-8555 / JP | 03 /
OGAWA, Fukuo c/o SUMCO TECHXIV CORPORATION 1324-2 Masuragahara-machi Omura-shi Nagasaki 856-8555 / JP | 04 /
KUBOTA, Toshimichi c/o SUMCO TECHXIV CORPORATION 1324-2 Masuragahara-machi Omura-shi Nagasaki 856-8555 / JP | 05 /
FUKUDA, Tomohiro c/o SUMCO TECHXIV CORPORATION 1324-2 Masuragahara-machi Omura-shi Nagasaki 856-8555 / JP | [2013/05] |
Former [2011/23] | 01 /
NARUSHIMA, Yasuhito c/o SUMCO TECHXIV CORPORATION 1324-2 Masuragahara-machi Omura-shi Nagasaki 856-8555 / JP | ||
02 /
KAWAZOE, Shinichi c/o SUMCO TECHXIV CORPORATION 1324-2 Masuragahara-machi Omura-shi Nagasaki 856-8555 / JP | |||
03 /
OGAWA, Fukuo c/o SUMCO TECHXIV CORPORATION 1324-2 Masuragahara-machi Omura-shi Nagasaki 856-8555 / JP | |||
04 /
KUBOTA, Toshimichi c/o SUMCO TECHXIV CORPORATION 1324-2 Masuragahara-machi Omura-shi Nagasaki 856-8555 / JP | |||
05 /
FUKUDA, Tomohiro c/o SUMCO TECHXIV CORPORATION 1324-2 Masuragahara-machi Omura-shi Nagasaki 856-8555 / JP | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/05] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2011/23] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09802962.2 | 28.07.2009 | [2011/23] | WO2009JP63440 | Priority number, date | JP20080195999 | 30.07.2008 Original published format: JP 2008195999 | [2011/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010013719 | Date: | 04.02.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2330234 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2330234 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C30B15/04, C30B29/06 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
C30B15/04 (EP,US);
Y10T117/10 (EP,US);
Y10T117/1004 (EP,US);
Y10T117/1024 (EP,US);
Y10T117/1032 (EP,US);
Y10T117/1056 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/23] | C30B15/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZIEHUNG EINES SILIZIUMEINKRISTALLS | [2011/23] | English: | SILICON SINGLE CRYSTAL PULL-UP APPARATUS | [2011/23] | French: | APPAREIL DE TIRAGE DE MONOCRISTAL DE SILICIUM | [2012/34] |
Former [2011/23] | APPAREIL D'EXTRACTION DE MONOCRISTAL DE SILICIUM | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2011 | Translation filed | 17.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 29.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.07.2009 | AT | 30.01.2013 | BE | 30.01.2013 | CY | 30.01.2013 | CZ | 30.01.2013 | DK | 30.01.2013 | EE | 30.01.2013 | FI | 30.01.2013 | HR | 30.01.2013 | IT | 30.01.2013 | LT | 30.01.2013 | LV | 30.01.2013 | MC | 30.01.2013 | MK | 30.01.2013 | MT | 30.01.2013 | NL | 30.01.2013 | PL | 30.01.2013 | RO | 30.01.2013 | SE | 30.01.2013 | SI | 30.01.2013 | SK | 30.01.2013 | SM | 30.01.2013 | TR | 30.01.2013 | BG | 30.04.2013 | NO | 30.04.2013 | GR | 01.05.2013 | ES | 11.05.2013 | IS | 30.05.2013 | PT | 30.05.2013 | GB | 28.07.2013 | IE | 28.07.2013 | LU | 28.07.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | FR | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
IT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
MK | 30.01.2013 | ||
MT | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
SM | 30.01.2013 | ||
TR | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
GB | 28.07.2013 | ||
IE | 28.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
IT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
SM | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
GB | 28.07.2013 | ||
IE | 28.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
IT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
GB | 28.07.2013 | ||
IE | 28.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
IT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
GB | 28.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
IT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
GB | 28.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
IT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
IT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
IT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 30.01.2013 | |
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 30.01.2013 | |
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 30.01.2013 | |
NO | 30.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5324488 (KLINGSHIRN HERBERT [DE] ET AL) [A] 1,2 * figure 1 * | International search | [A]JPS61227986 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK); | [A]JPS5988394 (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN); | [A]JP2005336020 (SUMCO CORP); | [A]JPH09227275 (SUMITOMO SITIX CORP) | by applicant | JP2005336020 |