EP2309801 - RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND RADIO COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMAKI, Tsuyoshi c/o Hitachi Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09802993.7 | 29.07.2009 | [2011/15] | WO2009JP63507 | Priority number, date | JP20080195691 | 30.07.2008 Original published format: JP 2008195691 | [2011/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010013751 | Date: | 04.02.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2309801 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/18, H04B7/04, H04J99/00, H04W16/28, H04W24/10, H04B7/02, H04B7/06 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
H04W28/22 (EP,US);
H04B7/022 (EP,US);
H04B7/024 (EP,US);
H04B7/0417 (EP,US);
H04B7/0452 (EP,US);
H04B7/0626 (EP,US);
H04L25/0204 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/15] | H04W48/18, H04B7/04, H04J99/00, H04W16/28, H04W24/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/15] | Title | German: | FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2011/15] | English: | RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND RADIO COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2011/15] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION | [2011/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2011 | Translation filed | 28.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 15.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2008045781 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [I] 1-19 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0075] * * figures 2,3B,7,8 *; | [A]US2008075033 (SHATTIL STEVE J [US]) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0207] - paragraph [0242] * * figures 1H, 1I, 2A, 2B, 4C, 8C, 11 *; | [A]US2002055356 (DULIN DAVID R [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0073] * * figures 3,4 *; | [XI]US2006105724 (NAKAO SEIGO [JP]) [X] 18 * figures 2,4 * * paragraph [0197] * * claims 1,7 * [I] 19; | [A]WO2007124566 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 20 - page 21 * * claims 1-3 * | International search | [A]JP2007502071 (INTEL CORP.); | [A] - YANG SONG ET AL., "Coexistence of Collaborative MIMO with SIngle-Base-Station Based MIMO", IEEE 802.16 BROADBAND WIRELESS ACCESS WORKING GROUP, (20070819), URL: http://www.ieee802.org/16/tgm/contrib/C80216m-07_163.doc, (20090904), XP008141303 | by applicant | JP2007096727 | JP2008092433 | JP2005102136 | - "Writing on dirty paper", M. COSTA, IEEE Trans. Inform. Theory, IEEE, (198305), vol. 29, page 440 | - W. YU; J.M. CIOFFI, "Sum capacity of Gaussian vector broadcast channels", IEEE TRANS. INFORM. THEORY, (200409), vol. 50, no. 9, pages 1875 - 1892 | - "Enhancing the cellular downlink capacity via co-processing at the transmitting end", S. SHAMAI; B. ZAIDEL, Proceedings of IEEE Vehicular Tech. Conf., SPRING, (200105), pages 1745 - 1749 | - "Applications of Space Division Multiplexing and Those Performance in a MIMO Channel", TAKEO OHGANE; TOSHIHIKO NISHIMURA; YASUTAKA OGAWA, Institute of Electronics, Information and Communication Engineers, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS, (200409), vol. J-87_B |