EP2313111 - TOLL-LIKE RECEPTOR AGONIST FORMULATIONS AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VentiRx Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1191 Second Avenue, Suite 1105 Seattle, WA 98101 / US | [2014/01] |
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Ventirx Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 12651 High Bluff Drive Suite 200 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOWBERT, J., Jeffry 6106 232nd Avenue NE Redmond, WA 98053 / US | 02 /
DUVVURI, Muralikrishna 104 Bristol Drive Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US | 03 /
HERSHBERG, Rob 900 Lenora Street, 1103 Seattle, WA 98121 / US | 04 /
DIETSCH, Greg 17732 105th Avenue SE Snohomish, WA 98296 / US | [2011/30] |
Former [2011/21] | 01 /
HOWBERT, J., Jeffry 6106 232nd Avenue NE Redmond, WA 98053 / US | ||
02 /
DUVVURI, Muralikrishna 5544 Sunlight Drive, 288 Durham, NC 27707 / US | |||
03 /
HERSHBERG, Rob 900 Lenora Street, 1103 Seattle, WA 98121 / US | |||
04 /
DIETSCH, Greg 17732 105th Avenue SE Snohomish, WA 98296 / US | |||
Former [2011/19] | 01 /
HOWBERT, J., Jeffry 6106 232nd Avenue NE Redmond, WA 98053 / US | ||
02 /
DUVVURI, Muralikrishna 5544 Sunlight Drive, 208 Durham, NC 27707 / US | |||
03 /
HERSHBERG, Rob 910 Lenora Street, S905 Seattle, WA 98121 / US | |||
04 /
DIETSCH, Greg 17732 105th Avenue SE Snohomish, WA 98296 / US | |||
Former [2011/17] | 01 /
HOWBERT, J., Jeffry 6106 232nd Avenue NE Redmond Washington 98053 / US | ||
02 /
DUVVURI, Muralikrishna 5544 Sunlight Drive 208 Durham NC 27707 / US | |||
03 /
HERSHBERG, Rob 910 Lenora Street S905 Seattle WA 98121 / US | |||
04 /
DIETSCH, Greg 17732 105th Avenue SE Snohomish WA 98296 / US | Representative(s) | Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | [2013/15] |
Former [2011/17] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 09803657.7 | 31.07.2009 | [2011/17] | WO2009US52422 | Priority number, date | US20080137694P | 01.08.2008 Original published format: US 137694 P | [2011/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010014913 | Date: | 04.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2313111 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2313111 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/08, A61K31/724, A61K47/00, A61K9/00, A61K9/19, // A61K31/395, A61K47/48, A61P35/00, A61P31/12 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K31/724 (EP,US);
A61K47/40 (US);
A61K47/6951 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (EP,US);
A61K9/19 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
C07D223/16 (EP,US);
C08B37/0012 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/17] | A61K39/395 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/17] | Title | German: | TOLL-REZEPTORAGONISTEN-FORMULIERUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2011/17] | English: | TOLL-LIKE RECEPTOR AGONIST FORMULATIONS AND THEIR USE | [2011/17] | French: | FORMULATIONS D'AGONISTE DES RÉCEPTEURS DE TYPE TOLL ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2011/17] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 13.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 04.09.2013 | CY | 04.09.2013 | EE | 04.09.2013 | HR | 04.09.2013 | LT | 04.09.2013 | LV | 04.09.2013 | MK | 04.09.2013 | MT | 04.09.2013 | RO | 04.09.2013 | SI | 04.09.2013 | SK | 04.09.2013 | SM | 04.09.2013 | GR | 05.12.2013 | IS | 04.01.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/28] | BG | 04.09.2013 | |
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 04.09.2013 | |
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 04.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9612493 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8,10,11 * See page 2, second paragraph: beta cyclodextrin compositions for increasing bioavailability and absorption of pharmaceutically active compounds. See examples 1-7: compositions comprising beta cyclodextrin and a benzoazepine compound. See claim 2: use to treat HIV * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]WO9855148 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [X] 1,7,8,10 * See page 2, lines 4-20; page 5, lines 30-35; examples 2, 8: pharmaceutical compositions comprising a b-benzoazepine and a cyclodextrin as solubility enhancer * [Y] 1-15; | [Y] - RAJEWSKI R A ET AL, "PHARMACEUTICAL APPLICATIONS OF CYCLODEXTRINS. 2. IN VIVO DRUG DELIVERY", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION, WASHINGTON, US, (19961101), vol. 85, no. 11, doi:10.1021/JS960075U, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 1142 - 1169, XP000629515 [Y] 1-15 * See abstract and table 1: beta cyclodextrin and sulfobutylether of cyclodextrin for use in drug delivery for parenteral and other delivery routes * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/js960075u | [Y] - CHALLA R ET AL, "Cyclodextrins in drug delivery: an updated review", AAPS PHARMSCITECH, SPRINGER NEW YORK LLC, US, (20051014), vol. 6, no. 2, doi:10.1208/PT060243, ISSN 1530-9932, pages E329 - E357, XP008136705 [Y] 1-15 * See abstract and table 1: beta cyclodextrin and sulfobutylether of cyclodextrin for use in drug delivery systems. See page E337: effects on drug stability * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1208/pt060243 | International search | [Y]WO2007024612 (ARRAY BIOPHARMA INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2007197478 (JONES PETER [GB], et al); | [Y]US2008008682 (CHONG LEE S [US], et al) | by applicant | US4120649 | US4665077 | WO2007024612 | - MAIONE ET AL., CANCER RES., (1990), vol. 51, pages 2077 - 2083 | - TOLMA ET AL., J. CELL IOL., (1993), vol. 122, pages 497 - 511 | - TOLSMA ET AL., J. CELL BIOL., (1993), vol. 122, pages 497 - 511 | - SAGE ET AL., J. CELL. BIOCHEM., (1995), vol. 57, pages 1329 - 1334 | - CAO, PROG MOL SUBCELL BID., (1998), vol. 20, pages 161 - 176 | - BROOKS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 264, pages 569 - 571 | - HAMMES ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (1996), vol. 2, pages 529 - 533 | - MIN ET AL., CANCER RES., (1996), vol. 56, pages 2428 - 33 | - CROWLEY ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI., (1993), vol. 90, pages 5021 - 25 |