EP2369969 - BAR ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wenko-Wenselaar GmbH & Co. KG Im Hülsenfeld 10 40721 Hilden / DE | [2011/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÖLLNER, Hanns-Joachim Im Heidewinkel 32 40625 Düsseldorf / DE | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Kreuzkamp, Markus orka Partnerschaft mbB Kaistraße 6 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Kreuzkamp, Markus Ludenberger Strasse 1a 40629 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09804246.8 | 06.11.2009 | WO2009DE75066 | Priority number, date | DE20082013799U | 27.11.2008 Original published format: DE 202008013799 U | [2011/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010060425 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2369969 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/38 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
A47K3/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STANGENANORDNUNG | [2011/40] | English: | BAR ARRANGEMENT | [2011/40] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE BARRES | [2011/40] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 14.12.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2008184479 (BATHURST VERONICA L [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8,12 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0030]; figure - * [I] 4,9-11; | [A]US2006070177 (BATHURST DAVID B [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure - * | by applicant | US2005278844 | WO2008032095 | US3104014 |