EP2314546 - DEMINERALIZER AND HOT WATER SUPPLY APPARATUS PROVIDED WITH THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YASUI, Keiko c/o Panasonic Corporation intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi ,Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
OKETA, Takemi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
HORIKI, Taisuke c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi,Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
SASABE, Shigeru c/o panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations company IP Development center 7f-Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 shiromi ,Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2011/33] |
Former [2011/17] | 01 /
Keiko Yasui c/o Panasonic Corporation intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi ,Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
Takemi Oketa c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
03 /
Taisuke Horiki c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi,Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
04 /
Shigeru Sasabe c/o panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations company IP Development center 7f-Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 shiromi ,Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09804647.7 | 08.01.2009 | [2011/17] | WO2009JP00035 | Priority number, date | JP20080204004 | 07.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008204004 | JP20080231734 | 10.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008231734 | [2011/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010016160 | Date: | 11.02.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2314546 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/469, B01D61/48, C02F1/46, C02F5/00, C02F5/08, F24H1/00 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
C02F1/4602 (EP);
B01D61/48 (EP);
B01D61/485 (EP);
C02F5/025 (EP);
C02F5/08 (EP);
F24D19/0092 (EP);
B01D2311/2642 (EP);
C02F1/001 (EP);
C02F1/42 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/17] | Title | German: | DEMINERALISIERER UND HEISSWASSERZUFUHRVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2011/17] | English: | DEMINERALIZER AND HOT WATER SUPPLY APPARATUS PROVIDED WITH THE SAME | [2011/17] | French: | APPAREIL DE DÉMINÉRALISATION ET APPAREIL D'ALIMENTATION EN EAU CHAUDE LE COMPORTANT | [2011/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2010 | Translation filed | 07.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 28.02.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2007319753 (ORGANO KK); | [A]JP2002143854 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2001340863 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2001334269 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH08108184 (HITACHI LTD) | by applicant | JPH0768256 | JP2006043549 |