EP2319994 - DOZER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kubota Corporation 2-47, Shikitsuhigashi 1-chome Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 556-8601 / JP | [2011/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYUKI, Shigeru c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION Sakai Seizosho 64 Ishizukitamachi Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-0823 / JP | 02 /
NAKAO, Toshihiro c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION Sakai Seizosho 64 Ishizukitamachi Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-0823 / JP | 03 /
KAWASAKI, Masayuki c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION Sakai Seizosho 64 Ishizukitamachi Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-0823 / JP | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | Crease, Devanand John, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | Crease, Devanand John, et al Keltie Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 09804779.8 | 09.03.2009 | [2011/19] | WO2009JP54402 | Priority number, date | JP20080200832 | 04.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008200832 | JP20080200833 | 04.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008200833 | JP20080200834 | 04.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008200834 | JP20080200835 | 04.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008200835 | JP20080315609 | 11.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008315609 | [2011/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010016292 | Date: | 11.02.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2319994 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/76 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
E02F3/7627 (EP,US);
E02F3/76 (KR);
E02F3/7631 (EP,US);
E02F3/80 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/19] | Title | German: | SCHÜRFRAUPENVORRICHTUNG | [2011/19] | English: | DOZER DEVICE | [2011/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BOUTEUR | [2011/19] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2010 | Translation filed | 22.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 10.03.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US3084461 (BECKFORD JAMES J) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 58; figures 1,5,6,9 * [A] 3,6,7; | [Y]US4013132 (MATSUZAWA KUNIHIKO) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 7; figures 4,8 *; | [Y]US2950550 (FRENCH JOHN L) [Y] 4 * figures 2,3 *; | [XD]JP2001164597 (KUBOTA KK) [XD] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0015]; figure 2 * | International search | [X]JP2001164597 (KUBOTA KK); | [Y]JPH07268909 (CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD); | [Y]JP2006233641 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) | by applicant | JP2001164597 | JPS61162639 |