EP2324044 - STING (STIMULATOR OF INTERFERON GENES), A REGULATOR OF INNATE IMMUNE RESPONSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barber, Glen N. 8598 SW 168th Terrace Palmetto Bay, FL 33157 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/48] | For all designated states Barber, Glen, N. 8598 SW 168 Terrace Palmetto Bay, FL 33157 / US | ||
Former [2011/21] | For all designated states University of Miami 1475 N.W. 12th Avenue Room 2012 - (M811) Miami, FL 33136 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/48] |
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
BARBER, Glen, N. 8598 SW 168 Terrace Palmetto Bay FL 33157 / US | ||
Former [2011/21] | 01 /
BARBER, Glen, N. 13520 Sw 99th Court Miami FL 33176 / US | Representative(s) | Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | Inspicos A/S Kogle Allé 2 P.O. Box 45 2970 Hørsholm / DK | Application number, filing date | 09805473.7 | 04.08.2009 | [2011/21] | WO2009US52767 | Priority number, date | US20080129975P | 04.08.2008 Original published format: US 129975 P | [2011/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010017248 | Date: | 11.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2324044 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/00, C07K14/52, A61K38/00 | [2011/21] | CPC: |
C07K14/4702 (EP,US);
A61K31/136 (EP,US);
A61K31/196 (EP,US);
A61K31/4748 (EP,US);
A61K31/517 (EP,US);
A61K31/7048 (EP,US);
A61K31/711 (EP,US);
A61K31/713 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61K39/39 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
C12N15/113 (US);
C12N15/1138 (EP,US);
C12N15/117 (EP);
A61K2300/00 (US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/711, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/713, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/21] | Title | German: | STING (STIMULATOR VON INTERFERONGENEN) ALS REGULATOR ANGEBORENER IMMUNREAKTIONEN | [2011/21] | English: | STING (STIMULATOR OF INTERFERON GENES), A REGULATOR OF INNATE IMMUNE RESPONSES | [2011/21] | French: | STING (STIMULATEUR DE GÈNES D INTERFÉRON), UN RÉGULATEUR DE RÉPONSES IMMUNITAIRES INNÉES | [2011/21] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 22.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/03] | 16.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/03] | Divisional application(s) | EP15169327.2 / EP2942357 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.02.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 10.02.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.02.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008003614 (CHEN ZHIJIAN JAMES [US], et al) [A] 17* the whole document *; | [XP] - HIROKI ISHIKAWA ET AL, "STING is an endoplasmic reticulum adaptor that facilitates innate immune signalling", NATURE, (20080824), vol. 455, no. 7213, doi:10.1038/nature07317, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 674 - 678, XP055021546 [XP] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature07317 | [XP] - BO ZHONG ET AL, "The Adaptor Protein MITA Links Virus-Sensing Receptors to IRF3 Transcription Factor Activation", IMMUNITY, (20080925), vol. 29, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.immuni.2008.09.003, ISSN 1074-7613, pages 538 - 550, XP055021580 [XP] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.immuni.2008.09.003 | [XP] - WENXIANG SUN ET AL, "ERIS, an endoplasmic reticulum IFN stimulator, activates innate immune signaling through dimerization", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (20090511), vol. 106, no. 21, pages 8653 - 8658, XP055021622 [XP] 1-20 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO03048202 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP], et al); | [Y] - JIN ET AL., "MPYS, a Novel Membrane Tetraspanner, Is Associated with Major Histocompatibility Comples Class II and Mediates Transduction of Apoptotic Signals", MOL. CELL. BIOL., (20080616), vol. 28, no. 16, pages 5014 - 5026, XP008143230 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.00640-08 | [Y] - RING ET AL., "Mechanisms of Tamoxifen Resistance", ENDOCRINE-RELATED CANCER, (2004), vol. 11, pages 643 - 658, XP008143228 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1677/erc.1.00776 |