EP2315846 - PSA AND KLK2 AS THERAPEUTIC TARGETS AND MOLECULES INHIBITING PSA AND KLK2 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Rochester 601 Elmwood Avenue Box OTT Rochester, NY 14642 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | For all designated states University Of Rochester 601 Elmwood Avenue Box OTT Rochester, NY 14642 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Chawnshang 19 Sandy Lane Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | [2011/18] | Representative(s) | Leißler-Gerstl, Gabriele Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | Leissler-Gerstl, Gabriele Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09805479.4 | 05.08.2009 | [2011/18] | WO2009US52779 | Priority number, date | US20080086461P | 05.08.2008 Original published format: US 86461 P | US20080093285P | 29.08.2008 Original published format: US 93285 P | US20080093353P | 31.08.2008 Original published format: US 93353 P | [2011/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010017257 | Date: | 11.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2315846 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/50, G01N33/574 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
G01N33/5011 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
G01N33/574 (EP,US);
G01N33/57434 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/136 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/18] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/18] | Title | German: | PSA UND KLK2 ALS THERAPEUTISCHE ZIELMOLEKÜLE SOWIE PSA- UND KLK2-HEMMENDE MOLEKÜLE | [2011/18] | English: | PSA AND KLK2 AS THERAPEUTIC TARGETS AND MOLECULES INHIBITING PSA AND KLK2 | [2011/18] | French: | PSA ET KLK2 EN TANT QUE CIBLES THÉRAPEUTIQUES ET MOLÉCULES INHIBANT PSA ET KLK2 | [2011/18] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 25.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/50] | 07.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005112705 (BRACCO LAURENT [FR], et al) [X] 10,11,13,14 * par 0001-0002, 0010, 0044, 0076-0083, 0085, 0087-0088; cl 25, 27, 29, 44-46. * [Y] 1-9,12; | [XYI]US2003054053 (YOUNG CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 10,11,13,14 * par 0007, 0011, 0023, 0035-0037, 0049, 0051, 0060, 0067; Fig. 2; cl 17-20 * [Y] 12 [I] 2-4,6,7,9; | [I]US2003055108 (YOUNG CHARLES [US]) [I] 2-4,6,7,9 * par 0006, par 0044, cl 13-15. *; | [Y]US2006270591 (CHANG CHAWNSHANG [US]) [Y] 1,3-9,12 * par 0004, 0057, 0066, 0171, 0519. * | [X] - CHEN SOPHIE ET AL, "Down-regulation of androgen-receptor and PSA by phytochemicals.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ONCOLOGY FEB 2008 LNKD- PUBMED:18202763, (200802), vol. 32, no. 2, ISSN 1019-6439, pages 405 - 411, XP002660757 [X] 2-4,6,7,9 * pg 405-411. * | [Y] - NIU Y ET AL, "Prostate-Specific Antigen Promote Prostate Cancer Cell Growth via Modulating Androgen Receptor Activation", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20070520), vol. 177, no. 4 supplement, ISSN 0022-5347, page 89, XP008143258 [Y] 1-9,12 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2006074026 (HAZEN STANLEY L [US], et al); | [Y]US2007149469 (KORHERR CHRISTIAN [DE]); | [Y]US2006270591 (CHANG CHAWNSHANG [US]) | [Y] - NIU, Y. ET AL., "Prostate-Specific Antigen Promote Prostate Cancer Cell Growth via Modulating Androgen Receptor Activation.", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, vol. 177, no. 4,SUPP, page 89, XP008143258 |