EP2394003 - SYSTEM FOR EXPLOITING NATURAL RESOURCES FOR BUILDINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Indesit Company, S.p.A. Viale Aristide Merloni No. 47 60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONGINI, Dino c/o Indesit Company S.p.A. Via Lamberto Corsi 55 I-60044 Fabriano (Ancona) / IT | 02 /
MATTIONI, Giancarlo c/o Indesit Company S.p.A. Via Lamberto Corsi 55 I-60044 Fabriano (Ancona) / IT | 03 /
PRACCHI, Pier Andrea c/o Indesit Company S.p.A. Via Lamberto Corsi 55 I-60044 Fabriano (Ancona) / IT | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Gallarotti, Franco Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Gallarotti, Franco Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 09805951.2 | 29.12.2009 | WO2009IB55984 | Priority number, date | IT2009TO00068 | 04.02.2009 Original published format: IT TO20090068 | [2011/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010089636 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2394003 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/08, E03B1/04, E03B3/02, E03B3/03 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
E04D13/08 (EP);
E03B3/02 (EP);
E03B3/03 (EP);
E04D2013/0873 (EP);
Y02A20/00 (EP);
Y02A20/108 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/50] | E04D13/08, E03B1/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR AUSBEUTE VON NATÜRLICHEN RESSOURCEN FÜR GEBÄUDE | [2011/50] | English: | SYSTEM FOR EXPLOITING NATURAL RESOURCES FOR BUILDINGS | [2011/50] | French: | SYSTÈME D'EXPLOITATION DE RESSOURCES NATURELLES D'UN BATIMENT | [2011/50] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 13.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/21] | 20.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]GB2437527 (SHEPHARD IAN [GB]) [X] 1-3,11 * page 3, paragraph L * * page 5, line 4 - line 23; figure - * [A] 7-10,15 [I] 4-6,12-14; | [AD]FR2545864 (GENET GERARD [FR]) [AD] 1-3,12 * figure .; claims 1-5 *; | [A]GB2397537 (TRINCAS NICHOLAS JOHN [GB]) [A] 1-3,14-15 * page 4, paragraph L * * page 8, paragraph 4 - page 11, paragraph 3; figure - *; | [A]DE9206685U (W. OLDORF) [A] 1-3 * figure - *; | [A]DE19522433 (KRESSE REINER [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]GB2304780 (BANNOCKS STEPHEN ARTHUR [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2545864 | WO2006072181 | WO2008093334 | WO2008114268 |