EP2382226 - PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF L-FUCOSYL DI- OR OLIGOSACCHARIDES AND NOVEL 2,3,4 TRIBENZYL-FUCOSYL DERIVATIVES INTERMEDIATES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inalco S.p.A. Via Calabiana 18 20139 Milan / IT | [2011/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALSINI, Liana Via Antonio Gramsci 238 1.2 I-55047 Seravezza / IT | 02 /
MANONI, Marco Via Carmignanese 103 I-50059 Vinci / IT | 03 /
CIPOLLETTI, Giovanni Via Magolfa 13 I-20143 Milano / IT | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Valenza, Silvia, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Valenza, Silvia, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 09806138.5 | 18.12.2009 | WO2009IB55841 | Priority number, date | IT2008FI00244 | 18.12.2008 Original published format: IT FI20080244 | [2011/44] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010070616 | Date: | 24.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2382226 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2382226 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07H1/00, C07H3/06 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
C07H1/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
C07H3/04 (KR);
C07H3/06 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Extension states | AL | 18.07.2011 | BA | 18.07.2011 | RS | 18.07.2011 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE VON L-FUCOSYL-DI- ODER OLIGOSACCHARIDEN UND NEUE 2,3,4-TRIBENZYLFUCOSYLDERIVATE ALS ZWISCHENPRODUKTE DAFÜR | [2011/44] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF L-FUCOSYL DI- OR OLIGOSACCHARIDES AND NOVEL 2,3,4 TRIBENZYL-FUCOSYL DERIVATIVES INTERMEDIATES THEREOF | [2011/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SYNTHÈSE DE DISACCHARIDES OU D'OLIGOSACCHARIDES DE L-FUCOSYLE ET DE NOUVEAUX INTERMÉDIAIRES DE CEUX-CI DU TYPE 2,3,4-TRIBENZYLFUCOSYLE | [2011/44] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 21.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2009 | AT | 04.12.2013 | BE | 04.12.2013 | BG | 04.12.2013 | CY | 04.12.2013 | CZ | 04.12.2013 | DK | 04.12.2013 | EE | 04.12.2013 | ES | 04.12.2013 | FI | 04.12.2013 | HR | 04.12.2013 | IT | 04.12.2013 | LT | 04.12.2013 | LV | 04.12.2013 | MC | 04.12.2013 | MK | 04.12.2013 | MT | 04.12.2013 | NL | 04.12.2013 | PL | 04.12.2013 | RO | 04.12.2013 | SE | 04.12.2013 | SI | 04.12.2013 | SK | 04.12.2013 | SM | 04.12.2013 | TR | 04.12.2013 | IE | 18.12.2013 | LU | 18.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | FR | 04.02.2014 | GB | 04.03.2014 | NO | 04.03.2014 | GR | 05.03.2014 | IS | 04.04.2014 | PT | 04.04.2014 | DE | 01.07.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 18.12.2009 | |
AT | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MK | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
TR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 18.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 04.02.2014 | ||
GB | 04.03.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/39] | HU | 18.12.2009 | |
AT | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
TR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 18.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 04.02.2014 | ||
GB | 04.03.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | HU | 18.12.2009 | |
AT | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
TR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 18.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 04.02.2014 | ||
GB | 04.03.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 18.12.2009 | |
AT | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
TR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 18.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 04.02.2014 | ||
GB | 04.03.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
TR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 04.02.2014 | ||
GB | 04.03.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 04.02.2014 | ||
GB | 04.03.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 04.02.2014 | ||
GB | 04.03.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 04.02.2014 | ||
GB | 04.03.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 04.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 04.12.2013 | |
NO | 04.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X] - H. KUNZ, C. UNVERZAGT, "Synthesis of alpha-fucosyl glycosides using 4-methoxybenzyl (Mpm) protected fucosyl donors", J. PRAKT. CHEM., (1992), vol. 334, pages 579 - 583, XP002545666 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/prac.19923340706 | [X] - H. KUNZ, C. UNVERZAGT, "Schutzgruppenabhängige Stabilität von Intersaccharid-Bindungen - Synthese eines Fucosyl-Chitobiose-glycopeptids", ANGEW. CHEM., (1988), vol. 100, pages 1763 - 1765, XP002545667 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ange.19881001212 | [X] - K. VON DEM BRUCH, H. KUNZ, "Synthese von N-Glycopeptid-Clustern mit LewisX-Antigen-Seitenketten und deren Bindung an Trägerproteine", ANGEW. CHEM., (1994), vol. 106, pages 87 - 89, XP002545668 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ange.19941060112 | [X] - P. SÖDERMAN ET AL., "Synthesis of trifucosylated N-linked hexasaccharide of a glycoprotein from Haemonchus contortus", EUR. J. ORG. CHEM., (2002), pages 1614 - 1618, XP002545669 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * | [X] - W. KINZY, A. LÖW, "Kohlenhydrat-Bausteine zum Aufbau Tumor-assoziierter Antigene. Synthese von Lewis Y-Determinanten", CARBOHYDRATE RES., (1993), vol. 245, pages 193 - 218, XP002545670 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0008-6215(93)80072-M | [X] - S.A. ABBAS ET AL., "Synthesis of O-alpha-L-fucopyranosyl-(1-2)-O-beta-D-galactopyranosyl-(1-4)-D-glucopyranose (2'-O-alpha-L-fucopyranosyl-lactose)", CARBOHYDRATE RES., (1991), vol. 88, pages 51 - 60, XP002545671 [X] 7 * page 54 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6215(00)84600-5 | by applicant | US5945314 | - L. BODE, J. NUTR., (2006), vol. 136, pages 2127 - 2130 | - J. KEMSLEY, CHEM. & ENG. NEWS, (2008), vol. 86, no. 39, pages 13 - 17 | - CHATURVEDI P. ET AL., GLYCOBIOLOGY, (2001), vol. 11, no. 5, pages 365 - 372 | - H.M. FLOWERS ET AL., CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1967), vol. 4, pages 189 - 195 | - R.R. SCHMIDT; B. WEGMAN, CARBOHYD. RES., (1988), vol. 184, pages 254 - 261 | - S. A. ABBAS, CARBOHYDR. RES., (1981), vol. 88, pages 51 - 60 | - A. FERNANDEZ-MAYORALES, CARBOHYDR. RES., (1986), vol. 154, pages 93 - 101 | - R. K. JAIN ET AL., CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 212, pages C1 - C3 | - M. IZUMI, J. ORG. CHEM., (1997), vol. 62, pages 992 - 998 | - A. RENCUROSI, J. CARBOHYDRATE CHEM., (2001), vol. 20, pages 761 - 765 | - L. PANZA ET AL., CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 337, pages 1333 - 1342 | - A. RENCUROSI ET AL., EUR. J. ORG. CHEM., (2003), pages 1672 - 1680 | - W. KINZY ET AL., CARBOHYD. RES., (1993), vol. 245, pages 193 - 218 | - S. DROUILLARD ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2006), vol. 45, no. 11, pages 1778 - 1780 | - T. MURATA, J. CARBOHYD. CHEM., (2003), vol. 22, no. 5, pages 309 - 316 | - E.BEAT ET AL., CAN. J. CHEM., (2000), vol. 78, no. 6, pages 892 - 904 | - B.G. DAVIES, "Recent Developments in Oligosaccharide Synthesis", J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS. I, (2000), pages 2137 - 2160 | - I. ROBINA ET AL., "Glycosylation Methods in Oligosaccharide Synthesis", CURRENT ORGANIC SYNTHESIS, (2008), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 33 - 60 | - I. ROBINA ET AL., "Glycosylation Methods in Oligosaccharide Synthesis", CURRENT ORGANIC SYNTHESIS, (2008), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 81 - 116 | - R. R. SCHMIDT; A. TOEPFER, J. CARBOHYD. CHEM, (1993), vol. 12, no. 7, pages 809 - 822 | - KOENIGS, W.; KNOOR, E., CHEM. BER., vol. 1901, no. 34, page 957 | - HELFERICH, B.; ZIRNER, J. CHEM. BER., (1962), vol. 95, page 2604 | - FLOWERS ET AL., CARBOHYD. RES., (1971), vol. 18, pages 215 - 226 | - S. A. ABBAS ET AL., CARBOHYDR. RES., (1981), vol. 88, pages 51 - 60 | - BARILI ET AL., CARBOHYD. RES., (1997), vol. 298, pages 75 - 84 | - Y. ISHIZUKA ET AL., J. CARBOHYD. CHEM., (1999), vol. 18, no. 5, pages 523 - 533 |