EP2328570 - METHOD AND FORMULATION FOR TREATING ADVERSE BIOLOGICAL CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Livionex Inc. 104 Milani Court Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHUSHAN, Rajiv 3838 Mumford Place Palo Alto CA 94306 / US | 02 /
GIN, Jerry, B. 1206 Sargent Drive Sunnyvale CA 94087 / US | 03 /
GOSWAMY, Amit 104 Milani Court Los Gatos CA 95030 / US | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 09806991.7 | 17.08.2009 | [2011/23] | WO2009US04709 | Priority number, date | US20080189060P | 15.08.2008 Original published format: US 189060 P | [2011/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010019276 | Date: | 18.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2328570 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/10, A61K48/00, A61K31/7105, A61K39/395, A61K38/19, A61P35/00, A61P3/10 | [2011/23] | CPC: |
A61K31/10 (EP,US);
A61K31/7105 (EP,US);
A61K48/0008 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND FORMULIERUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG UNERWÜNSCHTER BIOLOGISCHER ZUSTÄNDE | [2011/23] | English: | METHOD AND FORMULATION FOR TREATING ADVERSE BIOLOGICAL CONDITIONS | [2011/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET FORMULATION DE TRAITEMENT D'ÉTATS BIOLOGIQUES INDÉSIRABLES | [2011/23] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 25.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/21] | 08.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2012 | 31.08.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2008099397 (DERMA YOUNG LTD [IL], et al) [XP] 1-18 * page 18, line 23 - line 30 * | International search | [X]US2006177430 (BHUSHAN RAJIV [US], et al); | [A]US6403116 (ANDERSON MARK L [US], et al); | [A]WO2004002534 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]); | [A]WO2007149287 (RAMAEKERS NUTRITION LLC [US], et al); | [A]EP1254961 (TRANSGENE SA [FR], et al) |