EP2329418 - LOYALTY MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.05.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cates, Thomas M. 19 Willis Holden Drive Acton, MA 01720 / US | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Cloughley, Peter Andrew Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Cloughley, Peter Andrew Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 09807088.1 | 06.08.2009 | [2011/23] | WO2009US52934 | Priority number, date | US20080088405P | 13.08.2008 Original published format: US 88405 P | US20090535682 | 05.08.2009 Original published format: US 535682 | [2011/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010019433 | Date: | 18.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2329418 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, G06Q30/06 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q10/063 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/23] | G06F19/00, G06F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Title | German: | MESSUNG DER KUNDENTREUE | [2011/23] | English: | LOYALTY MEASUREMENT | [2011/23] | French: | MESURE DE FIDÉLITÉ | [2011/23] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 17.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2013 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 12.11.2013 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 29.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.01.2015 | 28.01.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/25] | 09.02.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US2007156515 (HASSELBACK DANA J [US], et al); | [A]US2007271111 (DUBINSKY GEORGE S [US]); | [Y]US2008021750 (MASUYAMA HIROAKI [JP], et al); | [X]KR100838688B (KOTSA [KR]) |