EP2335178 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR ONLINE FRAUD PROTECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states First Data Corporation 6200 South Quebec Street Suite 270 Greenwood Village, CO 80111 / US | [2011/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMGART, Mark, D. 8321 Sugarloaf Road Larkspur CO 80118 / US | [2011/25] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09807252.3 | 12.08.2009 | [2011/25] | WO2009US53605 | Priority number, date | US20080190392 | 12.08.2008 Original published format: US 190392 | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010019707 | Date: | 18.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2335178 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/06 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
G06Q20/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4014 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/25] | G06F21/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME FÜR ONLINE-BETRUGSSCHUTZ | [2011/25] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR ONLINE FRAUD PROTECTION | [2011/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE PROTECTION CONTRE LA FRAUDE EN LIGNE | [2011/25] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 28.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/30] | 15.01.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/30] | 09.03.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - EPO, "Mitteilung des Europäischen Patentamts vom 1. Oktober 2007 über Geschäftsmethoden = Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods = Communiqué de l'Office européen des brevets,en date du 1er octobre 2007, concernant les méthodes dans le domaine des activités", JOURNAL OFFICIEL DE L'OFFICE EUROPEEN DES BREVETS.OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE.AMTSBLATTT DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS, OEB, MUNCHEN, DE, (20071101), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0170-9291, pages 592 - 593, XP007905525 [L] 1-15 * Statement in accordance with the Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods(OJ 11/2007; p592-593). The claimed-subject matter, with due regard to the description and drawings, relates to processes comprised in the list of subject-matter and activities excluded from patentability under Art.52 (2) and (3) EPC. The applicant is advised that in accordance with the established practice of the EPO, no search need be performed in respect of those aspects of the claimed invention. The only identifiable technical aspects of the claimed invention relate to the use of conventional, general-purpose data processing technology for processing data of an inherently non-technical nature. The information technology employed is considered to have been generally known as it was widely available to everyone at the date of filing/priority of the present application. The notoriety of such prior art cannot reasonably be contested. No documentary evidence was therefore considered required. * | International search | [A]US2003154406 (HONARVAR LAURENCE TORAJ [US], et al); | [A]US2005116025 (DAVIS BRUCE L [US]); | [A]US2006202012 (GRANO DAVID [US], et al); | [X]US2007177768 (TSANTES GEORGE K [US], et al) |