EP2409261 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SMART CARD WHICH HAS A CONTACTLESS INTERFACE AND AN INTERFACE WITH CONTACTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2016/24] |
Former [2012/04] | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOOS, Rainer Lindenstrasse 128 57080 Siegen / DE | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 6208 65052 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | Blumbach Zinngrebe patentConsult Postfach 6208 65052 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2012/08] | Blumbach - Zinngrebe patentConsult Postfach 6208 65052 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2012/04] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 09807573.2 | 17.12.2009 | [2016/24] | WO2009DE01782 | Priority number, date | DE20091014343 | 21.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009014343 | [2012/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010108463 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2409261 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2409261 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
G06K19/07743 (EP);
G06K19/07724 (EP);
G06K19/07749 (EP);
G06K19/07769 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER EINE KONTAKTLOSE UND EINE KONTAKTBEHAFTETE SCHNITTSTELLE AUFWEISENDEN CHIPKARTE | [2012/04] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SMART CARD WHICH HAS A CONTACTLESS INTERFACE AND AN INTERFACE WITH CONTACTS | [2012/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE CARTE À PUCE PRÉSENTANT UNE INTERFACE SANS CONTACT ET UNE INTERFACE À CONTACTS | [2012/04] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 07.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 15.06.2016 | CY | 15.06.2016 | CZ | 15.06.2016 | DK | 15.06.2016 | EE | 15.06.2016 | FI | 15.06.2016 | HR | 15.06.2016 | LT | 15.06.2016 | LV | 15.06.2016 | MC | 15.06.2016 | MK | 15.06.2016 | MT | 15.06.2016 | RO | 15.06.2016 | SI | 15.06.2016 | SK | 15.06.2016 | SM | 15.06.2016 | TR | 15.06.2016 | NO | 15.09.2016 | GR | 16.09.2016 | IS | 15.10.2016 | PT | 17.10.2016 | IE | 17.12.2016 | LU | 17.12.2016 | BE | 31.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/38] | BG | 15.06.2016 | |
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MK | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
TR | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 17.12.2016 | ||
LU | 17.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | CY | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MK | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
TR | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 17.12.2016 | ||
LU | 17.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 17.12.2016 | ||
LU | 17.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 15.06.2016 | |
NO | 15.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4105869 (SCHNEIDER EDGAR [DE]) [A] 1-12* column 1, line 3 - column 4, line 40 *; | [XYI]US5612532 (IWASAKI HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1,3,8,11,12 * column 1, line 10 - line 54 * * column 4, line 59 - column 6, line 65 * [Y] 2,5,6 [I] 4,7,9,10; | [Y]US5617297 (LO RANDY [US], et al) [Y] 2,5 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 39 *; | [Y]DE102007044482 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0040] * | Examination | EP1930845 |