EP2517476 - AN APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLOTTE, Benedict Thomas Kellonsoittajankatu 8 b 9 FI-20500 Turku / FI | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Smith, Gary John, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Jaatinen, Jussi Imari Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 09807609.4 | 24.12.2009 | WO2009EP67928 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011076289 | Date: | 30.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2517476 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/22, H04R1/28, H04M1/03 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
H04R1/2811 (EP,US);
H04M1/035 (EP,US);
H04R1/225 (EP,US);
H04R2499/11 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG | [2012/44] | English: | AN APPARATUS | [2012/44] | French: | APPAREIL | [2012/44] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 11.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/50] | 21.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6104808 (ALAMEH RACHID M [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * figure 4 * * column 7, line 15 - line 25 *; | [XI]US6144738 (HAWKER LARRY E [CA], et al) [X] 1-5,8,12-14,16-19,23,25,29,30 * figures 2,3 * * column 3, line 28 - line 64 * * column 4, line 15 - line 38 * [I] 9-11,15,24,26,28,31,32; | [A]WO0234006 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-32 * figure 3 ** column 5, line 65 - line 67 *; | [XI]US6785395 (ARNESON THEODORE R [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,12-17,19,23,25,28-31 * figure 4 * * column 7, line 63 - column 8, line 8 * [I] 9-11,18,24,26,32 |