EP2346353 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING FENUGREEK HYDROCOLLOIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rubicon Research Private Limited 221, Annexe Building Opposite Indira Container Yard Goregaon Mulund Link Road, Bhandup (West) Mumbai 400 078 Maharashtra / IN | [N/P] |
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states Rubicon Research Private Limited 221, Annexe Building Goregaon Mulund Link Road Opposite Indira Container Yard Off L.B.S. Marg, Bhandup (W) Mumbai 400 078 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PILGAONKAR, Pratibha, Sudhir 221 Annexe Building Goregaon Mulund Link Road Opposite Indira Container Yard Off L.B.S. Marg Bhandup (West) Mumbai 400 078 Maharashtra / IN | 02 /
RUSTOMJEE, Maharukh, Tehmasp 221 Annexe Building Goregaon Mulund Link Road Opposite Indira Container Yard Off L.B.S. Marg Bhandup (West) Mumbai 400 078 Maharashtra / IN | 03 /
GANDHI, Anilkumar, Surendrakumar 221 Annexe Building Goregaon Mulund Link Road Opposite Indira Container Yard Off L.B.S. Marg Bhandup (West) Mumbai 400 078 Maharashtra / IN | 04 /
SUVARNAPATHAKI, Rupali, Kedar 221 Annexe Building Goregaon Mulund Link Road Opposite Indira Container Yard Off L.B.S. Marg Bhandup (West) Mumbai 400 078 Maharashtra / IN | [2011/30] | Representative(s) | Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Harrison IP Limited 1st Floor, Box Tree House Northminster Business Park Northfield Lane York YO26 6QU / GB | ||
Former [2011/30] | Srinivasan, Ravi Chandran J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09807644.1 | 01.10.2009 | [2011/30] | WO2009IN00544 | Priority number, date | IN2008MUM2123 | 03.10.2008 Original published format: IN MU21232008 | [2011/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010041273 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2346353 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/0526, A23C9/154, A23L1/30, C08L5/00, A23L1/308 | [2011/30] | CPC: |
C08L5/00 (EP,US);
A23C9/1544 (EP,US);
A23G3/42 (EP,US);
A23G9/34 (EP,US);
A23G9/42 (EP,US);
A23L29/238 (EP,US);
A23L33/21 (EP,US);
A61K8/737 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
C08B37/0087 (EP,US);
C08L1/04 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L1/04, C08L2666/26 (EP,US);
C08L5/00, C08L2666/26 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/30] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, DIE BOCKSHORNKLEE-HYDROCOLLOIDE ENTHALTEN | [2011/30] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING FENUGREEK HYDROCOLLOIDS | [2011/30] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DES HYDROCOLLOÏDES DE FENUGREC | [2011/30] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 06.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/42] | 08.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0775451 (VITAMED REMEDIES PRIVATE LIMIT [IN]) [X] 1-14* examples 3, 4; claims 10-14 *; | [X]US5997877 (CHANG PETER [CA]) [X] 1-7 * claim 12 *; | [X]US2001024665 (RAO GARRIMELLA B [IN], et al) [X] 1-7 * claim 37 *; | [X]WO2005009453 (POTLURI RAMESH BABU [IN], et al) [X] 1-14 * examples 1-8 *; | [X] - SHALINI HOODA & SUDESH JOOD, "Nutritional Evaluation of Wheat-Fenugreek Blends for Product Making", PLANT FOODS FOR HUMAN NUTRITION, (2004), vol. 59, pages 149 - 154, XP002580994 [X] 1-14 * p 149 - Materials & Methods, Preparation of blends * * p. 150 Preparation of Products * | by applicant | US5066508 | US5336515 | EP0742007 | US5847109 | WO0007715 | EP1104652 | WO0174371 | US6403066 | EP1381282 | JP2004203799 | JP2004203800 | JP2004203803 | JP2005013099 | US2005075497 | WO2006081996 | FR2883473 | JP2007006732 | US2007140992 | EP1697050 |