EP2324471 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DEVELOPING AN ELECTROLUMINESCENT SIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2015 [2015/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scobil Industries Corp. 111 Russell Hill Road Toronto, Ontario M4V 2S9 / CA | [2011/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIELDER, Scott Stephen 6 Forrest Laneway Suite 2301 Toronto, Ontario M2N 5X9 / CA | 02 /
PIETRO, William Joseph 68 Corporate Drive, Suite 2025 Toronto, Ontario M1H 3H3 / CA | [2011/21] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | [2011/40] |
Former [2011/21] | De Anna, Pier Luigi Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09807777.9 | 06.08.2009 | [2011/21] | WO2009CA01101 | Priority number, date | US20080193515 | 18.08.2008 Original published format: US 193515 | [2011/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010020034 | Date: | 25.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2324471 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 25.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G09F9/30, G09G3/30, G09F13/22, G09F13/00 | [2014/17] | CPC: |
G09F13/22 (EP,US);
G09F13/005 (EP,US);
G09F2013/225 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/21] | G09F9/30, G09G3/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ENTWICKLUNG EINES ELEKTROLUMINESZENTEN SCHILDES | [2011/21] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DEVELOPING AN ELECTROLUMINESCENT SIGN | [2011/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE CONCEPTION D'UNE ENSEIGNE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE | [2011/21] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 21.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/19] | 26.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007029939 (BURKUM PHILIP [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5-11 * the whole document * [I] 4; | [A]US2007082123 (ALDARONDO LUIS [US] ET AL) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007021362 (MOTOROLA INC [US]; JONNALAGADDA KRISHNA D [US]; GAMOTA DANIEL R [US];) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO2008070098 (GOLLE ET AL.); | [X]US2005091890 (SNYDER); | [A]WO2007018996 (BURKUM ET AL.); | [A]US2007082123 (ALDARONDO ET AL.) |