EP2314537 - BATTERY COOLING STRUCTURE OF HYBRID INDUSTRIAL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2011/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGAWA Kiyomitsu c/o General Machinery&Special Vehicle Headquarters MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 3000 Tana Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 229-1193 / JP | [2013/03] |
Former [2011/17] | 01 /
OGAWA Kiyomitsu c/o General Machinery&Special Vehicle Headquarters MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 3000 Tana Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 229-1193 / JP | Representative(s) | Garkisch, Marcus Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [2013/03] |
Former [2011/17] | Garkisch, Marcus Patentanwälte Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09808228.2 | 13.08.2009 | [2011/17] | WO2009JP64305 | Priority number, date | JP20080210303 | 19.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008210303 | [2011/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010021292 | Date: | 25.02.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2314537 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2314537 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/075, B60K11/06, B60K1/04, B60K11/08, B60L11/12, B60L11/18, B60L8/00 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
B60K1/04 (EP,US);
B60K11/06 (EP,US);
B60K11/08 (EP,US);
B60L50/61 (EP,US);
B60L50/66 (EP,US);
B60L8/003 (EP,US);
B66F9/07531 (EP,US);
B66F9/07595 (EP,US);
B60K1/02 (EP,US);
B60K11/04 (EP,US);
B60K2001/005 (EP,US);
B60L2200/42 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/15 (EP,US);
Y02P90/60 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/17] | B66F9/075, B60K11/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/17] | Title | German: | BATTERIEKÜHLSTRUKTUR FÜR EIN INDUSTRIELLES HYBRIDFAHRZEUG | [2011/17] | English: | BATTERY COOLING STRUCTURE OF HYBRID INDUSTRIAL VEHICLE | [2011/17] | French: | STRUCTURE DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE BATTERIE POUR VÉHICULE DE FABRICATION HYBRIDE | [2011/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2011 | Translation filed | 18.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 11.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.08.2009 | AT | 16.01.2013 | BE | 16.01.2013 | CY | 16.01.2013 | CZ | 16.01.2013 | DK | 16.01.2013 | EE | 16.01.2013 | FI | 16.01.2013 | HR | 16.01.2013 | LT | 16.01.2013 | LV | 16.01.2013 | MC | 16.01.2013 | MK | 16.01.2013 | MT | 16.01.2013 | PL | 16.01.2013 | RO | 16.01.2013 | SE | 16.01.2013 | SI | 16.01.2013 | SK | 16.01.2013 | SM | 16.01.2013 | TR | 16.01.2013 | BG | 16.04.2013 | NO | 16.04.2013 | GR | 17.04.2013 | ES | 27.04.2013 | IS | 16.05.2013 | PT | 16.05.2013 | IE | 13.08.2013 | LU | 13.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
MK | 16.01.2013 | ||
MT | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
SM | 16.01.2013 | ||
TR | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
IE | 13.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
SM | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
IE | 13.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
IE | 13.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 16.01.2013 | |
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 16.01.2013 | |
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 16.01.2013 | |
NO | 16.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPS58101824 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JP2008063114 (TOYOTA IND CORP); | [A]JPH045122 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS); | [A]JPS5695927U (MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.) | by applicant | JPH10309002 | JP2001231837 | JP2007032534 | JP2008063114 |