EP2326375 - DEVICES AND METHODS FOR MINIMIZING AND TREATING HIGH-ALTITUDE SICKNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geno LLC 2941 Oxbow Circle Cocoa, FL 32926 / US | [2011/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINE, David 2941 Oxbow Circle Cocoa FL 32926 / US | 02 /
VASQUEZ, Gregory 105 Forest Avenue PMB 451 Cocoa FL 32922 / US | 03 /
JOHNSON, Bryan 480 Sail Lane Apartment 201 Merritt Island FL 32953 / US | [2016/40] |
Former [2011/22] | 01 /
FINE, David 2941 Oxbow Circle Cocoa FL 32926 / US | ||
02 /
VASQUEZ, Gregory 105 Forest Avenue PMB 451 Cocoa FL 32922 / US | |||
03 /
JOHNSON, Bryan 480 Sail Lane Apartment 201 Merritt Island FL 32953 / US | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/40] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2011/22] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 09808646.5 | 14.08.2009 | [2011/22] | WO2009US53945 | Priority number, date | US20090541144 | 13.08.2009 Original published format: US 541144 | US20080090617P | 21.08.2008 Original published format: US 90617 P | [2011/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010021941 | Date: | 25.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2326375 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2326375 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00, A61M16/10, A61M16/12, A61K33/00, A61M16/00, A61K31/198, A61M16/06 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
A61K33/00 (EP,US);
A61M16/10 (EP,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61M16/021 (EP,US);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61M16/0666 (EP,US);
A61M16/107 (EP,US);
A61M16/1075 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0208 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0275 (EP,US);
A61M2202/03 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3613 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K33/00, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0208, A61M2202/0007 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2012/34] | A61M15/00, A61M16/10, A61M16/12, A61K33/00, A61M16/00 | ||
Former IPC [2011/22] | A61M15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/40] |
Former [2011/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR MINIMIERUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON HÖHENANGST | [2011/22] | English: | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR MINIMIZING AND TREATING HIGH-ALTITUDE SICKNESS | [2011/22] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE RÉDUIRE AU MINIMUM ET DE TRAITER LE MAL D ALTITUDE | [2011/22] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/22] | 07.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 16.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.08.2009 | AT | 05.10.2016 | BE | 05.10.2016 | CY | 05.10.2016 | CZ | 05.10.2016 | DK | 05.10.2016 | EE | 05.10.2016 | ES | 05.10.2016 | FI | 05.10.2016 | HR | 05.10.2016 | IT | 05.10.2016 | LT | 05.10.2016 | LV | 05.10.2016 | MC | 05.10.2016 | MK | 05.10.2016 | PL | 05.10.2016 | RO | 05.10.2016 | SE | 05.10.2016 | SI | 05.10.2016 | SK | 05.10.2016 | SM | 05.10.2016 | TR | 05.10.2016 | BG | 05.01.2017 | NO | 05.01.2017 | GR | 06.01.2017 | IS | 05.02.2017 | PT | 06.02.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 14.08.2009 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
MK | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 14.08.2009 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 14.08.2009 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 05.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2006180147 (ROUNBEHLER DAVID R [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * figures 1-14 * [Y] 5,6,13; | [Y]US2006207594 (STENZLER ALEX [US], et al) [Y] 5,6,13 * figures 1,5,6,10-13 * | [XY] - I. S. ANAND ET AL, "Effects of Inhaled Nitric Oxide and Oxygen in High-Altitude Pulmonary Edema", CIRCULATION, (19981201), vol. 98, no. 22, doi:10.1161/01.CIR.98.22.2441, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 2441 - 2445, XP055032299 [X] 12-14,16,17 * abstract * * Methods * * table 2 * [Y] 13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.98.22.2441 | International search | [X]US2006048779 (ROUNBEHLER DAVID R [US], et al); | [Y]WO9507610 (AGA AB [SE], et al); | [A]US6758214 (FINE DAVID H [US], et al); | [A]US7025869 (FINE DAVID H [US], et al) | Examination | - ANONYMOUS, "Brochure - KIN-TEK Trace Source(TM) refillable permeation tubes", INTERNET, (20080828), page 6PP, URL: http://www.kin-tek.com/pdf/2_TraceSource.pdf, (20130306), XP055055417 |