EP2344856 - METHODS FOR COUNTING CORN SILKS OR OTHER PLURAL ELONGATED STRANDS AND USE OF THE COUNT FOR CHARACTERIZING THE STRANDS OR THEIR ORIGIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Hi-Bred International Inc. 7100 N.W. 62nd Avenue Johnston, IA 50131-1014 / US | [2011/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, Steven R. 3213 Leado Avenue Des Moines Iowa 50310 / US | 02 /
FARRINGTON, Ronald L. 10098th Street Nevada Iowa 50201 / US | 03 /
GOLDMAN, Daniel M. 4108 E. 29th Street Des Moines Iowa 50317 / US | 04 /
HANSELMAN, Travis A. 6017 N.W. 50th Street Johnston Iowa 50131 / US | 05 /
HAUSMANN, Neil J. 222 Baja Avenue Davis California 95616 / US | 06 /
SCHUSSLER, Jeffrey R. 2031 Fox Hollow Road Marion Iowa 52302 / US | 07 /
EDMEADES, Gregory 43 Hemans Street Cambridge 3432 / NZ | 08 /
BORRAS, Lucas Espana 1447 3A Rosario, CP: 2000, Prov. Santa Fe / AR | [2011/29] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Martin Peter J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/29] | Jackson, Martin Peter J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn GB-London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09808883.4 | 21.08.2009 | [2011/29] | WO2009US54639 | Priority number, date | US20080091054P | 22.08.2008 Original published format: US 91054 P | [2011/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010022346 | Date: | 25.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2344856 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/04 | [2011/29] | CPC: |
G06V20/69 (EP,US);
G06V20/53 (EP,US);
G06V20/66 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZÄHLUNG VON MAISGRANNEN ODER ANDEREN VIELFACHEN LÄNGLICHEN STRÄNGEN SOWIE VERWENDUNG DER ZÄHLUNG ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG DER STRÄNGE ODER IHRES URSPRUNGS | [2011/29] | English: | METHODS FOR COUNTING CORN SILKS OR OTHER PLURAL ELONGATED STRANDS AND USE OF THE COUNT FOR CHARACTERIZING THE STRANDS OR THEIR ORIGIN | [2011/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE COMPTAGE DE BARBES DE MAÏS OU D'AUTRES BRINS ALLONGÉS MULTIPLES ET UTILISATION DU COMPTAGE POUR CARACTÉRISER LES BRINS OU LEUR ORIGINE | [2011/29] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 01.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/32] | 31.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003079556 (SANCHEZ MARIO [US], et al); | [Y]EP0549895 (SPROUT BAUER INC ANDRITZ [US]); | [A]JPH1038769 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD, et al) |