EP2517447 - AN APPARATUS FOR USE IN PORTABLE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OZCAN, Koray 5 Tarragon Close Farnborough GU14 9XF / GB | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/22] | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2014/12] | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2013/50] | Smith, Gary John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2012/44] | Jaatinen, Jussi Imari Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 09809064.0 | 24.12.2009 | [2016/22] | WO2009EP67931 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011076291 | Date: | 30.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2517447 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2517447 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/03, H04R1/28 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
H04R1/2842 (EP,US);
H04M1/035 (EP,US);
H04R1/2803 (US);
H04R1/2819 (US);
H04R5/02 (US);
H04M1/18 (EP,US);
H04R2499/11 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI TRAGBAREN GERÄTEN | [2012/44] | English: | AN APPARATUS FOR USE IN PORTABLE DEVICES | [2012/44] | French: | APPAREIL DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS DES DISPOSITIFS PORTABLES | [2012/44] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 03.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.11.2015 | 19.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 26.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16160874.0 / EP3057293 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.12.2009 | AT | 01.06.2016 | BE | 01.06.2016 | BG | 01.06.2016 | CY | 01.06.2016 | CZ | 01.06.2016 | DK | 01.06.2016 | EE | 01.06.2016 | ES | 01.06.2016 | FI | 01.06.2016 | HR | 01.06.2016 | IT | 01.06.2016 | LT | 01.06.2016 | LV | 01.06.2016 | MC | 01.06.2016 | MK | 01.06.2016 | PL | 01.06.2016 | RO | 01.06.2016 | SE | 01.06.2016 | SI | 01.06.2016 | SK | 01.06.2016 | SM | 01.06.2016 | TR | 01.06.2016 | NO | 01.09.2016 | GR | 02.09.2016 | IS | 01.10.2016 | PT | 03.10.2016 | IE | 24.12.2016 | LU | 24.12.2016 | MT | 24.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | FR | 02.01.2017 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 24.12.2009 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
TR | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
IE | 24.12.2016 | ||
LU | 24.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 24.12.2009 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
TR | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
IE | 24.12.2016 | ||
LU | 24.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 24.12.2009 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
IE | 24.12.2016 | ||
LU | 24.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
IE | 24.12.2016 | ||
LU | 24.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 01.06.2016 | |
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 01.06.2016 | |
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 01.06.2016 | |
NO | 01.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB2345816 (MITEL CORP [CA]) [X] 1,2,5-7,10,11,13,14,17-19,21 * the whole document * [Y] 3,4,8,9,12,15,16,20; | [Y]WO2004034733 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [Y] 3,4,8,9,12,15,16,20 * the whole document *; | [E]US2010216526 (CHEN SHAOHAI [US], et al) [E] 1,18 * the whole document * | Examination | US2007223756 | by applicant | GB2345816 | WO2009056143 |