EP2328529 - EAR MUFF STYLE EAR PROTECTOR DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Loud&Clear Safety Pty Ltd 95 Warrigal Road Oakleigh, Victoria 3166 / AU | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOUNTAIN, Peter David 95 Warrigal Road Oakleigh Victoria 3166 / AU | 02 /
KRONE, Brendan Michael 37 Hornsby Drive Langwarrin Victoria 3910 / AU | 03 /
MAGREE, John 9 Ormond Avenue Mitcham Victoria 3132 / AU | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Håmsø Patentbyrå AS P.O. Box 171 4301 Sandnes / NO | [2020/51] |
Former [2011/23] | Håmsø Patentbyrå ANS Postboks 171 4302 Sandnes / NO | Application number, filing date | 09809093.9 | 19.08.2009 | [2011/23] | WO2009AU01064 | Priority number, date | AU20080904382 | 25.08.2008 Original published format: AU 2008904382 | AU20090903641 | 04.08.2009 Original published format: AU 2009903641 | [2011/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010022440 | Date: | 04.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2328529 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2328529 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 04.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F11/14, A61F9/04, A61F9/02 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
A61F11/14 (EP,US);
A61F9/029 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/23] | A61F11/06, A42B3/18, A61F9/04, A42B3/16, A61F9/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] |
Former [2011/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OHRSCHÜTZERARTIGE SCHUTZVORRICHTUNGEN FÜR FAHRZEUGE | [2011/23] | English: | EAR MUFF STYLE EAR PROTECTOR DEVICES | [2011/23] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE PROTECTION D'OREILLE DU TYPE COQUILLE ANTI-BRUIT | [2011/23] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 18.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 21.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.12.2020 | CY | 16.12.2020 | DK | 16.12.2020 | EE | 16.12.2020 | FI | 16.12.2020 | HR | 16.12.2020 | LT | 16.12.2020 | LV | 16.12.2020 | MC | 16.12.2020 | MK | 16.12.2020 | MT | 16.12.2020 | SI | 16.12.2020 | SK | 16.12.2020 | SM | 16.12.2020 | BG | 16.03.2021 | NO | 16.03.2021 | IS | 16.04.2021 | LU | 19.08.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
MK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
LU | 19.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
LU | 19.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
LU | 19.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | EE | 16.12.2020 | |
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 16.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0353930 (HELLBERG INT LTD [GB]) [X] 4,7-11 * column 7, line 38 - line 59; figure 6 * [Y] 5,6,12-15; | [XY]US2005015852 (BRHEL JOSEPH A [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0021]; figure 3 * [Y] 3; | [Y]WO2005051255 (PELTOR AB [SE], et al) [Y] 3,5,6,12-15* page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 26; figure 4 * | International search | [A]US4682374 (GEISER JOSEPH [US]); | [X]GB2209923 (SCOTT ALISTAIR EUAN); | [X]EP0353930 (HELLBERG INT LTD [GB]); | [A]DE3821536 (SCHEURER STEFAN [DE]); | [A]US5278999 (BROWN RONALD [US], et al); | [A]US5724119 (LEIGHT HOWARD S [US]); | [X]US2005015852 (BRHEL JOSEPH A [US]); | [X]US2006015989 (FAUSSETT SPRING S [US], et al); | [X]CN201001810Y (CONLON TECHNOLOGY DEV CO LTD [CN]) | by applicant | EP0353930 | US2005015852 |