EP2341052 - RING-FUSED MORPHOLINE DERIVATIVE HAVING PI3K-INHIBITING ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shionogi & Co., Ltd. 1-8 Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0045 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/27] | For all designated states Shionogi & Co., Ltd. 1-8 Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIOKA Masahiko c/o Shionogi&Co. Ltd. 12-4 Sagisu 5-chome Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 553-0002 / JP | 02 /
MITSUMORI Susumu c/o Shionogi&Co. Ltd. 12-4 Sagisu 5-chome Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 553-0002 / JP | 03 /
KUGIMIYA Akira c/o Shionogi&Co. Ltd. 12-4 Sagisu 5-chome Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 553-0002 / JP | 04 /
TANIYAMA Daisuke c/o Shionogi&Co. Ltd. 12-4 Sagisu 5-chome Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 553-0002 / JP | [2011/27] | Representative(s) | Harmsen, Dirk Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/27] | Harmsen, Dirk Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09811527.2 | 02.09.2009 | [2011/27] | WO2009JP65366 | Priority number, date | JP20080228905 | 05.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008228905 | JP20090169598 | 17.07.2009 Original published format: JP 2009169598 | [2011/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010027002 | Date: | 11.03.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2341052 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/04, A61K31/5383, A61K31/541, A61P1/00, A61P1/02, A61P1/04, A61P1/16, A61P1/18, A61P3/04, A61P3/10, A61P5/14, A61P7/00, A61P7/02, A61P7/06, A61P9/00, A61P9/04, A61P9/10, A61P11/00 | [2011/27] | CPC: |
C07D498/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/5383 (EP,US);
A61K31/541 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/04 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/02 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/27] | Title | German: | RINGKONDENSIERTES MORPHOLINDERIVAT MIT PI3K-HEMMENDER WIRKUNG | [2011/27] | English: | RING-FUSED MORPHOLINE DERIVATIVE HAVING PI3K-INHIBITING ACTIVITY | [2011/27] | French: | DERIVE DE MORPHOLINE À CYCLES CONDENSÉS AYANT UNE ACTIVITE INHIBITRICE DE PI3K | [2011/27] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2011 | Translation filed | 30.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/27] | 11.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/43] | 09.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008073785 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * claim 1 * * page 21 - paragraph 97 *; | [I]WO2008001076 (UCB PHARMA SA [BE], et al) [I] 1-16 * claim 5 *; | [X]WO2006040318 (APPLIED RESEARCH SYSTEMS [NL], et al) [X] 1-16 * claim 10; compound II *; | [X]WO2004056820 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 4; compound X *; | [X]WO2004052373 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 4; compound X *; | [X]WO2004006916 (APPLIED RESEARCH SYSTEMS [NL], et al) [X] 1-16 * claim 3; compound II * | International search | [X]JPS604188 (KAYAKU ANTIBIOTIC RESEARCH CO); | [X]WO0130782 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al); | WO03052001 [ ] (DSM NV [NL], et al); | [Y]JP2006510661 ; | [X]US2006161001 (HONG FANG-TSAO [US], et al); | [X]WO2006114706 (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al); | [X]WO2006133426 (RIGEL PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [X]JP2007500722 ; | [X]WO2007022257 (CHEMOCENTRYX INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2007024949 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al); | [X]WO2007125952 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP], et al); | [X]WO2007138974 (TOYAMA CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]JP2007536263 ; | [X]JP2008510684 ; | [Y]WO2008044022 (UCB PHARMA SA [BE], et al); | [X]WO2008051493 (SIGNAL PHARM LLC [US], et al); | [X]WO2008064274 (RIGEL PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [X]JP2008527048 ; | [XP]WO2009012421 (RIGEL PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [XP]WO2009025847 (NODALITY INC [US], et al); | [XP]WO2009073779 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al); | by applicant | JPH0729673 | JPH07145051 | US2001030782 | US2001053853 | US2002014315 | US2002020011 | JP2004007491 | JP2004006916 | JP2004056820 | JP2004052373 | US2005100349 | US2006018443 | US2006114706 | JP2007089034 | US2007117785 | US2008044022 | JP2008228905 | JP2009169598 |