EP2331745 - SELF-WRAPPING TEXTILE SLEEVE WITH PROTECTIVE COATING AND METHOD OF CONSTRUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Federal-Mogul Powertrain, Inc. 26555 Northwestern Highway Southfield, MI 48033 / US | [2011/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALLOY, Cassie 1201 Whitpain Hills Bluebell PA 19422 / US | 02 /
AVULA, Ramesh, R. 1412 Continental Circle Phoenixville PA 19460 / US | [2011/24] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/28] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/24] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09812254.2 | 04.09.2009 | [2011/24] | WO2009US55969 | Priority number, date | US20080094557P | 05.09.2008 Original published format: US 94557 P | US20090553231 | 03.09.2009 Original published format: US 553231 | [2011/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010028201 | Date: | 11.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2331745 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2331745 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/04, B60R16/02 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
H01B3/00 (EP,US);
D07B1/16 (KR);
B60R16/0215 (EP,US);
D03D1/0043 (EP);
D06B1/10 (US);
D07B1/04 (KR);
H01B3/50 (EP,US);
H02G3/0481 (EP,US);
D07B1/00 (EP,US);
D07B1/147 (EP,US);
D07B2201/2084 (EP,US);
D07B2201/2087 (EP,US);
D07B2201/2088 (EP,US);
D07B2201/209 (EP,US);
D07B2201/20903 (EP,US);
D07B2201/20907 (EP,US);
D07B2201/2092 (EP,US);
D07B2205/2071 (EP,US);
D07B2401/202 (EP,US);
D07B2401/2035 (EP,US);
D07B2401/2075 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1362 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
D07B2205/2071, D07B2801/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/24] | D07B1/16, D07B1/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] |
Former [2011/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTWICKELNDE TEXTILHÜLLE MIT SCHUTZÜBERZUG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2011/24] | English: | SELF-WRAPPING TEXTILE SLEEVE WITH PROTECTIVE COATING AND METHOD OF CONSTRUCTION THEREOF | [2011/24] | French: | MANCHON TEXTILE À ENROULEMENT AUTOMATIQUE À REVÊTEMENT PROTECTEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE CONSTRUCTION | [2011/24] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 25.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.09.2009 | AT | 13.07.2016 | BE | 13.07.2016 | CY | 13.07.2016 | CZ | 13.07.2016 | DK | 13.07.2016 | EE | 13.07.2016 | ES | 13.07.2016 | FI | 13.07.2016 | HR | 13.07.2016 | LT | 13.07.2016 | LV | 13.07.2016 | MC | 13.07.2016 | MK | 13.07.2016 | NL | 13.07.2016 | PL | 13.07.2016 | RO | 13.07.2016 | SE | 13.07.2016 | SI | 13.07.2016 | SK | 13.07.2016 | SM | 13.07.2016 | TR | 13.07.2016 | IE | 04.09.2016 | LU | 04.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | MT | 30.09.2016 | BG | 13.10.2016 | GB | 13.10.2016 | NO | 13.10.2016 | GR | 14.10.2016 | IS | 13.11.2016 | PT | 14.11.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 04.09.2009 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
TR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 04.09.2016 | ||
LU | 04.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 04.09.2009 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 04.09.2016 | ||
LU | 04.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 04.09.2016 | ||
LU | 04.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 04.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 04.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 04.09.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
IE | 04.09.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 13.07.2016 | |
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 13.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0947621 (RELATS SA [ES]) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8-10 * paragraphs [0017] , [0019] , [0020] , [0023] , [0024]; claims 1,7-9,12 *; | [Y]EP1746324 (RELATS SA [ES]) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8-10 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0015] , [0020] , [0031] , [0036]; figure 1.4 * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0046] *; | [Y]GB2139142 (RAYCHEM LTD) [Y] 1,2,4-6,9 * page 3, lines 40-47,58; figures 2,3; claims 1,8,10,12 * * page 4, line 10 - line 13 * * page 5, line 4 - line 20 *; | [Y]US2004109965 (KLINKLIN EMMANUEL [FR]) [Y] 1,11-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007251595 (CHEN MING-MING [US]) [A] 1,11 * paragraphs [0008] , [0019] - [0021]; figure 3 * | [Y] - Anonymous, "Tutorial - How to apply and cure silicone coatings Typical Application Methods", (20060617), URL: http://www.dowcorning.com/content/textiles/26-1256-01a.pdf, (20140311), XP055106929 [Y] 1,11-13 * the whole document * | [L] - Anonymous, "Textiles and Leather - Industrial Textiles - Technical Articles - Dow Corning", (20060317), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20060317225447/http://www.dowcorning.com/contentapps/abstracts_index.asp?app=TechArticles&DCWS=Textiles%20and%20Leather&DCWSS=Industrial%20Textiles&Type=Technical%20Article, (20140311), XP055106931 [L] * page 1, paragraph l * | [Y] - Anonymous, "Tutorial Technical Textiles Coating - Dow Corning", (20040626), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20040626162438/http://www.dowcorning.com/content/textiles/texind/tutorial_technical_textiles_coating.asp, (20140311), XP055106979 [Y] 1,11-13 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2008124976 (RODRIGUES THIERRY [FR], et al); | [A]JPH11121969 (NISHIKAWA RUBBER CO LTD); | [A]US6085416 (IKEDA TOMOHIRO [JP]); | [A]US2008006432 (YAMAGUCHI HIROKI [JP], et al) |