EP2352565 - WAGERING GAME ESTABLISHMENT DATA IMPORT/EXPORT ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WMS Gaming Inc. 800 South Northpoint Blvd. Waukegan, Illinois 60085 / US | [2011/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GURA, Damon E. 4425 N. Racine Ave Unit 1S Chicago, Illinois 60640 / US | 02 /
HIMAWAN, Budyanto 1564 S. Kembley Ave. Palatine, Illinois 60067 / US | 03 /
LAKSHMANAPERUMAL, Mahesh 9273 Fairway Drive Apt 310 Des-Plaines, Illinois 60016 / US | 04 /
MELUVEETTIL, Krishnakumar 2012 Chang Court Naperville, Illinois 60540 / US | 05 /
SCHULHOF, Scott H. 1842 N. Halsted Unit 2 Chicago, Illinois 60614 / US | [2011/42] |
Former [2011/32] | 01 /
GURA, Damon E. 928 West Buena Avenue Number 3 Chicago, Illinois 60613 / US | ||
02 /
HIMAWAN, Budyanto 21 Kristin Drive Unit 714 Schaumburg, Illinois 60195 / US | |||
03 /
LAKSHMANAPERUMAL, Mahesh 9273 Fairway Drive Apt 310 Des-Plaines, Illinois 60016 / US | |||
04 /
MELUVEETTIL, Krishnakumar 2012 Chang Court Naperville, Illinois 60540 / US | |||
05 /
SCHULHOF, Scott H. 1842 N. Halsted Unit 2 Chicago, Illinois 60614 / US | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 09812346.6 | 07.09.2009 | [2011/32] | WO2009US56147 | Priority number, date | US20080095039P | 08.09.2008 Original published format: US 95039 P | [2011/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010028322 | Date: | 11.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2352565 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/32 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
G07F17/3223 (EP,US);
G07F17/32 (EP,US);
G07F17/3276 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/32] | A63F9/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/32] | Title | German: | DATENIMPORTIERUNGS-/EXPORTIERUNGSARCHITEKTUR FÜR WETTSPIELEINRICHTUNG | [2011/32] | English: | WAGERING GAME ESTABLISHMENT DATA IMPORT/EXPORT ARCHITECTURE | [2011/32] | French: | ARCHITECTURE D'IMPORTATION/EXPORTATION DE DONNÉES D'ÉTABLISSEMENT DE JEUX DE PARIS | [2011/32] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 06.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/40] | 25.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - EPO, "Mitteilung des Europ?ischen Patentamts vom 1. Oktober 2007 ?ber Gesch?ftsmethoden = Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods = Communiqu? de l'Office europ?en des brevets,en date du 1er octobre 2007, concernant les m?thodes dans le domaine des activit?s", JOURNAL OFFICIEL DE L'OFFICE EUROPEEN DES BREVETS.OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE.AMTSBLATTT DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS, OEB, MUNCHEN, DE, (20071101), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0170-9291, pages 592 - 593, XP002498048 [L] * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2004248645 (BLACKBURN ET AL.); | [Y]US2007168463 (ROTHSCHILD); | [A]US6364769 (WEISS ET AL.); | [A]US6606708 (DEVINE ET AL.); | [A]US6816904 (LUGWIG ET AL.); | [A]US2008009344 (GRAHAM ET AL.) |