EP2366071 - SEALED ONE WAY ROLLER CLUTCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magna Powertrain Inc. 50 Casmir Court Concord, Ontario L4K 4J5 / CA | [2011/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Jianwen 93 Cherhill Dr. Vaughan, Ontario L6A 1H7 / CA | 02 /
STEELE, Sean 2619 Kenna Crt. Mississauga, Ontario L5K 5C2 / CA | 03 /
MUIZELAAR, Richard D. 2693 Jerring Mews Mississauga, Ontario L5L 2M7 / CA | [2011/38] | Representative(s) | Reuter, Silke Beatrix, et al Magna International (Germany) GmbH Kurfürst-Eppstein-Ring 11 63877 Sailauf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Völger, Silke Beatrix, et al Magna International (Germany) GmbH Kurfürst-Eppstein-Ring 11 63877 Sailauf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09812595.8 | 15.09.2009 | WO2009CA01289 | Priority number, date | US20080096935P | 15.09.2008 Original published format: US 96935 P | [2011/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010028512 | Date: | 18.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2366071 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 18.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16D41/067, F16D13/74, F02N15/02 | [2017/46] | CPC: |
F16D41/067 (EP,US);
F16D41/064 (KR);
F02N15/023 (EP,US);
F16D41/06 (KR);
F16D41/20 (KR);
F16D13/74 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/38] | F16D41/067, F16D13/74, F16D15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EINGEKAPSELTE EINWEGROLLENKUPPLUNG | [2011/38] | English: | SEALED ONE WAY ROLLER CLUTCH | [2011/38] | French: | EMBRAYAGE À ROUE LIBRE À ROULEAUX UNIDIRECTIONNEL HERMÉTIQUEMENT FERMÉ | [2011/38] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/38] | 11.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/37] | 30.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/37] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 04.08.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 04.08.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.08.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 04.08.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 04.08.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.08.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 04.08.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 04.08.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.08.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 04.08.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 04.08.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.08.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002170795 (YASUI MAKOTO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,4,5 * paragraph [0003] - paragraphs [0005] , [ 0039]; figures 9-12 *; | [Y]JP2001012512 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [Y] 1,4,5 * abstract *; | [Y]US6401893 (KINOSHITA YOSHIO [JP]) [Y] 1,4,5 * column 5, line 38 - line 47; figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0554517 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) [A] 2,3 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 59; figures 4-6 *; | [A]US2003000796 (KAWAI MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 5,6 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0081]; figures 3,6 *; | [A]GB2073339 (NADELLA) [A] 5-7 * figure 1 * | International search | [X]US7143881 (ICHIHARA TAKAHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]US6705444 (FUJIWARA HIDEKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5052518 (TROMMER WILLIAM C [US]); | [X]US4178805 (MAZZORANA ALFRED [FR]); | [A]US5476165 (AWAJI TOSHIO [JP], et al); | [A]US2008230341 (BARRAUD PIERRE-JULIEN [FR], et al); | [A]US6712188 (ANDO TOMOHARU [JP]); | [A]US2355805 (KOEPP ORVILLE W); | [A]JP2005240930 (KOYO SEIKO CO) | by applicant | US6629590 | US2006266611 | JP2001012512 |