EP2323419 - A METHOD, A DEVICE AND A SYSTEM FOR CONSTANT RATE DATA STREAM TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Kun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Jianlin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZOU, Shimin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2013/13] |
Former [2011/20] | 01 /
LI, Kun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
ZHOU, Jianlin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
03 /
ZOU, Shimin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/21] | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Dessauerstrasse 3 80992 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/20] | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Riesstrasse 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09812664.2 | 10.09.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009CN73851 | Priority number, date | CN20081149580 | 12.09.2008 Original published format: CN200810149580 | [2011/20] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010028598 | Date: | 18.03.2010 | Language: | ZH | [2010/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2323419 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2323419 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00, H04L12/54 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0067 (EP,US);
H04L47/22 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0071 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0064 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0084 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/13] | H04Q11/00, H04L12/56 | ||
Former IPC [2011/20] | H04Q11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR KONSTANTEN DATENSTROMÜBERTRAGUNG | [2011/20] | English: | A METHOD, A DEVICE AND A SYSTEM FOR CONSTANT RATE DATA STREAM TRANSMISSION | [2011/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME POUR UNE TRANSMISSION DE FLUX DE DONNÉES À DÉBIT CONSTANT | [2011/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2011 | Translation filed | 08.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 05.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2009 | AT | 27.03.2013 | BE | 27.03.2013 | CY | 27.03.2013 | CZ | 27.03.2013 | DK | 27.03.2013 | EE | 27.03.2013 | FI | 27.03.2013 | HR | 27.03.2013 | IT | 27.03.2013 | LT | 27.03.2013 | LV | 27.03.2013 | MC | 27.03.2013 | MK | 27.03.2013 | MT | 27.03.2013 | NL | 27.03.2013 | PL | 27.03.2013 | RO | 27.03.2013 | SE | 27.03.2013 | SI | 27.03.2013 | SK | 27.03.2013 | SM | 27.03.2013 | TR | 27.03.2013 | BG | 27.06.2013 | NO | 27.06.2013 | GR | 28.06.2013 | ES | 08.07.2013 | IS | 27.07.2013 | PT | 29.07.2013 | IE | 10.09.2013 | LU | 10.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
MK | 27.03.2013 | ||
MT | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
SM | 27.03.2013 | ||
TR | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
IE | 10.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
SM | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
IE | 10.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
IE | 10.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
IE | 10.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 27.03.2013 | |
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 27.03.2013 | |
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
NO | 27.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US2004218534 (SONG JAE-YEON [KR], et al); | [A]CN101150876 (ALCATEL SHANGHAI BELL CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101166062 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A] - ITU-T RECOMMENDATION G984.3 GIGABIT-CAPABLE PASSIVE OPTICAL NETWORKS (G-PON): TRANSMISSION CONVERGENCE LAYER SPECIFICATION, (20040222), XP002374420 |