EP2325851 - ADJUSTING SCREW STRUCTURE FOR OIL IMMERSED SOLENOID AND OIL IMMERSED SOLENOID WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | [2011/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMIZU, Hiroaki c/o Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 234 Matsumoto Hasetani-cho Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2239 / JP | [2016/45] |
Former [2011/21] | 01 /
SHIMIZU, Hiroaki c/o Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 234 Matsumoto Hasetani-cho Nishi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2239 / JP | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7, II. Aufgang 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/21] | Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7, II. Aufgang 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09812844.0 | 26.08.2009 | [2011/21] | WO2009JP04110 | Priority number, date | JP20080233896 | 11.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008233896 | [2011/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010029695 | Date: | 18.03.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2325851 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2325851 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01F7/16, F16K31/06, H01F7/126, H01F7/127 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
H01F7/1607 (EP,US);
H01F7/16 (KR);
F16K31/06 (KR);
H01F7/126 (KR);
H01F7/127 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/21] | H01F7/16, F16K31/06, H01F7/126 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/45] |
Former [2011/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STELLSCHRAUBENSTRUKTUR FÜR EINEN IN ÖL GETAUCHTEN ELEKTROMAGNETEN UND IN ÖL GETAUCHTER ELEKTROMAGNET DAMIT | [2011/21] | English: | ADJUSTING SCREW STRUCTURE FOR OIL IMMERSED SOLENOID AND OIL IMMERSED SOLENOID WITH SAME | [2011/21] | French: | STRUCTURE DE VIS DE RÉGLAGE DESTINÉE À UN SOLÉNOÏDE IMMERGÉ DANS L'HUILE, ET SOLÉNOÏDE IMMERGÉ DANS L'HUILE COMPORTANT CETTE STRUCTURE | [2011/21] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2011 | Translation filed | 24.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 01.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.08.2009 | AT | 09.11.2016 | BE | 09.11.2016 | CY | 09.11.2016 | CZ | 09.11.2016 | DK | 09.11.2016 | EE | 09.11.2016 | ES | 09.11.2016 | FI | 09.11.2016 | HR | 09.11.2016 | LT | 09.11.2016 | LV | 09.11.2016 | MC | 09.11.2016 | MK | 09.11.2016 | NL | 09.11.2016 | PL | 09.11.2016 | RO | 09.11.2016 | SE | 09.11.2016 | SI | 09.11.2016 | SK | 09.11.2016 | SM | 09.11.2016 | TR | 09.11.2016 | BG | 09.02.2017 | NO | 09.02.2017 | GR | 10.02.2017 | IS | 09.03.2017 | PT | 09.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 26.08.2009 | |
AT | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MK | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 26.08.2009 | |
AT | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 26.08.2009 | |
AT | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 09.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS59159402 (NISSAN MOTOR, et al) [X] 1,5,6 * abstract * * figures 1,2,6,7 * [I] 2-4; | [X]EP0428728 (SANMEI DENKI KK [JP]) [X] 1,6 * abstract * * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 21 * * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 24 *; | [A]US6460567 (HANSEN III CHARLES C [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 5, line 37 - column 5, line 14 * * column 11, lines 37-56 * * column 13, line 23 - column 14, line 6 * | International search | [Y]JPH0380172U (ATSUGI UNISIA CORP.); | [Y]JPS6448005U (CKD CONTROLS LTD.); | [Y]JPS6144811U (CKD CONTROLS LTD.); | [Y]JP2000018416 (NISSIN KOGYO KK); | [Y]JP2000161527 (CUMMINS ENGINE CO INC); | [A]JPH0552460U (UNISIA JECS CORP.) | by applicant | JP2006140417 |