EP2348389 - KEYPAD APPARATUS, MOBILE DEVICE COMPRISING SAME, AND KEYPAD CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neoviewkolon Co., Ltd. 1123 Jangcheok-Ri Eunha-Myeon Hongseong-Gun Chungcheongnam-Do 350-883 / KR | [2011/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Il-Ho 109-1105 Jugong Green Vill Namjang-Ri Hongseong-Eup Hongseong-Gun Chungcheongnam-Do 350-752 / KR | 02 /
GYOUNG, Chung-Hyoun 150-1 Yangchon-Ri Daesin-Myeon Yeoju-Gun Gyeonggi-do 469-842 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Young-Eun 539-20 Oksu 1-Dong Seongdong-Gu Seoul 133-846 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Tae-Su 167-17 Gwangan 2-dong Suyeong-Gu Busan 613-804 / KR | 05 /
YM, Woo-Bin 208-1404 Buyeong Apt. 851, Wolsan-Ri Hongseong-Gun Chungcheongnam-Do 350-751 / KR | [2014/16] |
Former [2011/30] | 01 /
PARK, Il-Ho 109-1105 Jugong Green Vill Namjang-Ri Hongseong-Eup Hongseong-Gun Chungcheongnam-Do 350-752 / KR | ||
02 /
GYOUNG, Chung-Hyoun 150-1 Yangchon-Ri Daesin-Myeon Yeoju-Gun Gyeonggi-do 469-842 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Young-Eun 539-20 Oksu 1-Dong Seongdong-Gu Seoul 133-846 / KR | |||
04 /
KIM, Tae-Su 167-17 Gwangan 2-dong Suyeong-Gu Busan 613-804 / KR | |||
05 /
YM, Woo-Bin 208-1404 Buyeong Apt. 851, Wolsan-Ri Hongseong-Gun Chungcheongnam-Do 350-751 / KR | Representative(s) | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Denninger Str. 169 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Cuvilliésstraße 14 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/30] | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Cuvilliésstraße 14 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09813196.4 | 13.07.2009 | [2011/30] | WO2009KR03821 | Priority number, date | KR20080088725 | 09.09.2008 Original published format: KR 20080088725 | KR20090047774 | 29.05.2009 Original published format: KR 20090047774 | [2011/30] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010030074 | Date: | 18.03.2010 | Language: | KO | [2010/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2348389 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2348389 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, H01L51/50, G06F3/02, G02F1/13 | [2011/30] | CPC: |
G06F3/0412 (EP);
G06F3/041 (KR,US);
G06F3/02 (KR);
G06F3/04886 (EP);
H04M1/22 (KR);
G06F3/044 (EP);
H10K2102/3031 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TASTENFELD, MOBILGERÄT DAMIT UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DAS TASTENFELD | [2011/30] | English: | KEYPAD APPARATUS, MOBILE DEVICE COMPRISING SAME, AND KEYPAD CONTROL METHOD | [2011/30] | French: | CLAVIER, DISPOSITIF MOBILE COMPRENANT CE DERNIER ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DU CLAVIER | [2011/30] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2011 | Translation filed | 08.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 21.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 05.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 05.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.03.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.07.2009 | AT | 16.04.2014 | BE | 16.04.2014 | CY | 16.04.2014 | CZ | 16.04.2014 | DK | 16.04.2014 | EE | 16.04.2014 | ES | 16.04.2014 | FI | 16.04.2014 | HR | 16.04.2014 | IT | 16.04.2014 | LT | 16.04.2014 | LV | 16.04.2014 | MC | 16.04.2014 | MK | 16.04.2014 | MT | 16.04.2014 | NL | 16.04.2014 | PL | 16.04.2014 | RO | 16.04.2014 | SE | 16.04.2014 | SI | 16.04.2014 | SK | 16.04.2014 | SM | 16.04.2014 | TR | 16.04.2014 | IE | 13.07.2014 | LU | 13.07.2014 | BG | 16.07.2014 | NO | 16.07.2014 | GR | 17.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | IS | 16.08.2014 | PT | 18.08.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 13.07.2009 | |
AT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
TR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 13.07.2014 | ||
LU | 13.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 13.07.2009 | |
AT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 13.07.2014 | ||
LU | 13.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 13.07.2014 | ||
LU | 13.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 13.07.2014 | ||
LU | 13.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 13.07.2014 | ||
LU | 13.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 13.07.2014 | ||
LU | 13.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
LU | 13.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
LU | 13.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
LU | 13.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
LU | 13.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 16.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007107903 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 2, line 8 - line 10 * * page 4, line 33 - line 34 * * page 8, line 21 - page 9, line 2 * * page 9, line 28 - line 33 *; | [A]WO2008040323 (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 24, line 32 - page 25, line 12 * * page 27, line 27 - page 29, line 7 * * page 30, line 10 - line 21 * * page 31, line 7 - line 17 * * page 34, line 24 - page 35, line 2 * * page 92, line 7 - line 27 * * page 123, line 6 - line 11 ** page 138, line 10 - page 139, line 22 * | International search | [X]KR20020079438 (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | [A]KR20020087359 (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | [A]KR100573895B (PANTECH CO., LTD.) |