EP2333259 - EXHAUST GAS PURIFYING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yanmar Co., Ltd. 1-32, Chaya-machi Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8311 / JP | [2014/51] |
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states Yanmar Co., Ltd. 1-32, Chaya-machi Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8311 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITSUDA Masataka c/o YANMAR CO. LTD. 1-32 Chaya-machi Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8311 / JP | [2014/51] |
Former [2011/24] | 01 /
MITSUDA Masataka c/o YANMAR CO. LTD. 1-32 Chaya-machi Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8311 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2014/51] |
Former [2011/24] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09814490.0 | 07.09.2009 | [2011/24] | WO2009JP65599 | Priority number, date | JP20080239402 | 18.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008239402 | [2011/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010032645 | Date: | 25.03.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2333259 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2333259 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/02, F01N3/24, F01N3/033, F01N13/18, F01N3/021 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
F01N3/0335 (EP,US);
F01N13/0093 (EP,US);
F01N13/0097 (EP,US);
F01N13/1805 (EP,US);
F01N13/1855 (EP,US);
F01N13/1894 (EP,US);
F01N3/0211 (EP,US);
F01N2470/02 (EP,US);
F01N2470/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/24] | F01N3/02, F01N3/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGASREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2011/24] | English: | EXHAUST GAS PURIFYING DEVICE | [2011/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF PURIFICATEUR DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT | [2011/24] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2011 | Translation filed | 06.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 08.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2009 | AT | 17.12.2014 | BE | 17.12.2014 | BG | 17.12.2014 | CY | 17.12.2014 | CZ | 17.12.2014 | DK | 17.12.2014 | EE | 17.12.2014 | ES | 17.12.2014 | FI | 17.12.2014 | HR | 17.12.2014 | IT | 17.12.2014 | LT | 17.12.2014 | LV | 17.12.2014 | MC | 17.12.2014 | MK | 17.12.2014 | MT | 17.12.2014 | NL | 17.12.2014 | PL | 17.12.2014 | PT | 17.12.2014 | RO | 17.12.2014 | SE | 17.12.2014 | SI | 17.12.2014 | SK | 17.12.2014 | SM | 17.12.2014 | TR | 17.12.2014 | NO | 17.03.2015 | GR | 18.03.2015 | IS | 17.04.2015 | IE | 07.09.2015 | LU | 07.09.2015 | [2018/37] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 07.09.2009 | |
AT | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BG | 17.12.2014 | ||
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MK | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
SM | 17.12.2014 | ||
TR | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
IE | 07.09.2015 | ||
LU | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 07.09.2009 | |
AT | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BG | 17.12.2014 | ||
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
SM | 17.12.2014 | ||
TR | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
IE | 07.09.2015 | ||
LU | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
IE | 07.09.2015 | ||
LU | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
IE | 07.09.2015 | ||
LU | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
LU | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
LU | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
LU | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 17.12.2014 | |
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 17.12.2014 | |
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 17.12.2014 | |
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 17.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4673423 (YUMLU SALIH V [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 11 - column 5, line 39; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5,6; | [Y]EP1321640 (DEUTZ AG [DE]) [Y] 5,6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2003159436 (FOSTER MICHAEL RALPH [US], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0025]; figure 1 *; | [A]JP2007146681 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 3,4* paragraphs [0032] - [0033]; figures 5,6 * | International search | [X]JP2007146681 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) | by applicant | JP2000145430 | JP2001173429 | JP2003027922 | JP2008082201 |