EP2338278 - Method for presenting an interactive video/multimedia application using content-aware metadata [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/26] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR VIDEO/MULTIMEDIA RENDERING, COMPOSITION, AND USER-INTERACTIVITY | ||
[2014/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2015/09] |
Former [2014/10] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | ||
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states RealNetworks, Inc. 2601 Elliott Avenue Suite 1000 Seattle, WA 98121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALVA, Hari 5834 Via De Ln Plata Cir Delary Beach, Florida 33484 / US | 02 /
PURI, Atul 16080 NE 85th Street Apt. N204 Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | [2011/26] | Representative(s) | Alton, Andrew, et al Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | Alton, Andrew, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2011/26] | Alton, Andrew, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09815150.9 | 16.09.2009 | [2011/26] | WO2009US57219 | Priority number, date | US20080192136P | 16.09.2008 Original published format: US 192136 P | [2011/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010033642 | Date: | 25.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2338278 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2338278 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/8543, H04N21/8545, H04N21/2343, H04N21/44, H04N21/472, H04N21/234 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
H04N21/23412 (EP,US);
G11B27/3081 (US);
G06F3/0481 (EP,US);
G06T11/60 (US);
G06T5/50 (US);
H04N19/115 (US);
H04N19/167 (US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N21/234318 (EP,US);
H04N21/234345 (EP,US);
H04N21/44012 (EP,US);
H04N21/440245 (EP,US);
H04N21/47205 (EP,US);
H04N21/4722 (EP,US);
H04N21/4725 (EP,US);
H04N21/4728 (EP,US);
H04N21/8543 (EP,US);
H04N21/8545 (EP,US);
H04N5/45 (EP,US);
G06T2200/24 (US);
G06T2200/32 (US);
H04L47/10 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/26] | H04N7/173, H04N7/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Darstellung einer interaktiven Video / Multimedia-Anwendung mit Metadaten, die die Inhalte berücksichtigt | [2014/33] | English: | Method for presenting an interactive video/multimedia application using content-aware metadata | [2014/33] | French: | Méthode pour présenter une application de vidéo / multimédia interactive utilisant des métadonnées tenant compte du contenu | [2014/33] |
Former [2011/26] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR VIDEO-/MULTIMEDIA-RENDERING, ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND BENUTZERINTERAKTIVITÄT | ||
Former [2011/26] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR VIDEO/MULTIMEDIA RENDERING, COMPOSITION, AND USER-INTERACTIVITY | ||
Former [2011/26] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LE RENDU, LA COMPOSITION ET L INTERACTIVITÉ AVEC L UTILISATEUR DE VIDÉO/MULTIMÉDIA | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 24.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15153432.8 / EP2890149 | EP17200292.5 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 08.12.2017 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.09.2009 | AT | 25.02.2015 | BE | 25.02.2015 | BG | 25.02.2015 | CY | 25.02.2015 | CZ | 25.02.2015 | DK | 25.02.2015 | EE | 25.02.2015 | ES | 25.02.2015 | FI | 25.02.2015 | HR | 25.02.2015 | IT | 25.02.2015 | LT | 25.02.2015 | LV | 25.02.2015 | MC | 25.02.2015 | MK | 25.02.2015 | MT | 25.02.2015 | NL | 25.02.2015 | PL | 25.02.2015 | PT | 25.02.2015 | RO | 25.02.2015 | SE | 25.02.2015 | SI | 25.02.2015 | SK | 25.02.2015 | SM | 25.02.2015 | TR | 25.02.2015 | NO | 25.05.2015 | GR | 26.05.2015 | IS | 25.06.2015 | IE | 16.09.2015 | LU | 16.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | FR | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 16.09.2009 | |
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MK | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.09.2015 | ||
LU | 16.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 16.09.2009 | |
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.09.2015 | ||
LU | 16.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.09.2015 | ||
LU | 16.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.09.2015 | ||
LU | 16.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.09.2015 | ||
LU | 16.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 25.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0205089 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 10, line 14 - page 13, line 7 ** figures 4A-4C *; | [X]EP1204277 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004068758 (DAILY MIKE [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 1,4 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0031] *; | [XY]EP1684517 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-7,11-13,15-18 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 8-10,14; | [Y]US2007230658 (OKADA SHIGEYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 8-10,14 * figures 1, 3 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0040] * | International search | [A]US2006028488 (GABAY SHAY [IL], et al); | [A]KR20060081375 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]); | [A]US2008141307 (WHITEHEAD STEVEN D [US]) |