EP2323493 - PROBIOTIC INFANT PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MJN U.S. Holdings LLC 2701 Patriot Boulevard 4th Floor Glenview, IL 60026 / US | For all designated states Alimentary Health Ltd. Building 2800 Cork Airport Business Park Kinsale Road Cork / IE | [2013/35] |
Former [2012/47] | For all designated states Mead Johnson Nutrition Company 2400 West Lloyd Expressway Evansville, IN 47721-0001 / US | ||
For all designated states Alimentary Health Ltd. Building 2800 Cork Airport Business Park Kinsale Road Cork / IE | |||
Former [2011/21] | For all designated states Mead Johnson Nutrition Company 2400 West Lloyd Expressway Evansville, IN 47721-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUSSELL, William Michael 2400 W. Lloyd Expressway Evansville, Indiana 47721-0001 / US | 02 /
CEDDIA, Michael 2400 W. Lloyd Expressway Evansville, Indiana 47721-0001 / US | [2011/21] | Representative(s) | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09815248.1 | 18.09.2009 | [2011/21] | WO2009US57434 | Priority number, date | US20080284208 | 19.09.2008 Original published format: US 284208 | [2011/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010033775 | Date: | 25.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2323493 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2323493 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2323493 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/00, C12N1/20 | [2011/21] | CPC: |
A61K35/745 (EP,US);
A23L33/135 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/202 (EP,US);
A61K31/702 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/202, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/702, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/21] | Title | German: | PROBIOTISCHE SÄUGLINGSPRODUKTE | [2011/21] | English: | PROBIOTIC INFANT PRODUCTS | [2011/21] | French: | PROBIOTIQUES POUR BÉBÉS | [2011/21] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 06.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2009 | AT | 24.10.2012 | BE | 24.10.2012 | CY | 24.10.2012 | CZ | 24.10.2012 | DK | 24.10.2012 | EE | 24.10.2012 | FI | 24.10.2012 | HR | 24.10.2012 | LT | 24.10.2012 | LV | 24.10.2012 | MC | 24.10.2012 | MK | 24.10.2012 | MT | 24.10.2012 | RO | 24.10.2012 | SI | 24.10.2012 | SK | 24.10.2012 | SM | 24.10.2012 | TR | 24.10.2012 | BG | 24.01.2013 | GR | 25.01.2013 | IS | 24.02.2013 | PT | 25.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
MK | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
SM | 24.10.2012 | ||
TR | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
SM | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
IS | 24.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - NAKAMURA Y ET AL, "Agent for preventing and/or treating allergies, comprises Bifidobacterium, or its processed substance chosen from e.g. culture, concentrate and paste of Bifidobacterium, as an active ingredient", 20061012, (20061012), vol. 2006, no. 80, XP002478986 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2007110849 (SECRETIN MARIE-CHRISTINE [CH]); | [A]US2007141039 (COLLINS JOHN K [IE], et al); | [XP]WO2008117266 (ALIMENTARY HEALTH LTD [IE], et al); | [A] - CHOURAQUI ET AL., "Assessment of the safety, tolerance, and protective effect against diarrhea of infant formulas containing mixtures of probiotics or probiotics and prebiotics in a randomized controlled trial.", AM J CLIN NUTR., (200805), vol. 87, no. 5, pages 1365 - 1373, XP008143235 | [A] - MEILE ET AL., "Safety assessment of dairy microorganisms: Propionibacterium and Bifidobacterium.", INT J FOOD MICROBIOL., (20080901), vol. 126, no. 3, pages 316 - 320, XP025432125 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijfoodmicro.2007.08.019 |