EP2340666 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DYNAMIC AUTOMATIC COMMUNICATION PATH SELECTION, DISTRIBUTED DEVICE SYNCHRONIZATION AND TASK DELEGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jumpstart Wireless Corporation 900 NW 17th Avenue, Suite 202 Delray Beach, FL 33445 / US | [2011/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONAR, Jeffrey, G. 702 Lake Shore Drive Delray Beach, FL 33444 / US | 02 /
TAFEL, Bryan Alicia Moreau De Justo 1750 Buenos Aires Capital Federal 1107 / AR | 03 /
PEKAREK, Adrian 609N 46th Avenue Hollywood, FL 33021 / US | 04 /
CHHIBBER, Subir 618 NW 13th St. Apt 37 Boca Raton, FL 33486 / US | 05 /
TOMAZIN, Kenneth, G. 1249 Sw 9th Street Boca Raton, FL 33486 / US | 06 /
GINTER, Karl 10404 43rd Avenue Beltsville, MD 20705 / US | 07 /
BARTMAN, Michael 8917 Paddock Lane Potomac, MD 20854 / US | [2011/29] |
Former [2011/27] | 01 /
BONAR, Jeffrey, G. 702 Lake Shore Drive Delray Beach, FL 33444 / US | ||
02 /
TAFEL, Bryan Alicia Moreau De Justo 1750 Buenos Aires Capital Federal 1107 / AR | |||
03 /
PEKAREK, Adrian 609N 46th Avenue Hollywood, FL 33021 / US | |||
04 /
CHHIBBER, Subir 618 NW 13th St. Apt 37 Boca Raton, FL 33486 / US | |||
05 /
TOMAZIN, Kenneth, G. 1249 Sw 9th Street Boca Raton, FL 33486 / US | |||
06 /
GINTER, Karl 10404 43rd Avenue Boca Raton, FL 33486 / US | |||
07 /
BARTMAN, Michael 8917 Paddock Lane Potomac, MD 20854 / US | Representative(s) | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/27] | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae Flach Haug Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09815336.4 | 21.09.2009 | [2011/27] | WO2009US57691 | Priority number, date | US20080098886P | 22.09.2008 Original published format: US 98886 P | [2011/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010033919 | Date: | 25.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2340666 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W40/02, H04W88/02, H04L29/08 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
H04W40/00 (EP);
H04B7/022 (EP);
H04B7/026 (EP);
H04L1/02 (EP);
H04L45/24 (EP);
H04L69/14 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2011/27] | H04W40/02, H04W88/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/27] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR DYNAMISCHE UND AUTOMATISCHE KOMMUNIKATIONSPFADAUSWAHL, SYNCHRONISATION VERTEILTER GERÄTE UND AUFGABENDELEGIERUNG | [2011/27] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DYNAMIC AUTOMATIC COMMUNICATION PATH SELECTION, DISTRIBUTED DEVICE SYNCHRONIZATION AND TASK DELEGATION | [2011/27] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉS À LA SÉLECTION D'UNE VOIE DE COMMUNICATION AUTOMATIQUE ET DYNAMIQUE, LA SYNCHRONISATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DISTRIBUÉ ET UNE DÉLÉGATION DE TÂCHE | [2011/27] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/27] | 01.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/38] | 02.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 28.03.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 28.03.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.04.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.03.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 28.03.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.04.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.2012 | 30.09.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005243857 (HOFSTAEDTER CHRISTIAN [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-11,13,14 * abstract * * figures 1,3 *; | [Y]US2005273488 (RYAN CHRISTOPHER [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-11,13,14 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015] *; | [I]EP1335563 (XEROX CORP [US]) [I] 1,12,13,15-17 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0022] * | International search | [A]US2003162555 (LOVELAND SHAWN DOMENIC [US]); | [A]US2007117586 (BILLMAIER JAMES A [US], et al); | [A]US2007174393 (BOSSCHAERT ALLAERT J D [IE], et al); | [A]US2006126620 (BONAR JEFFREY G [US], et al) | by applicant | US2005243857 | US2005273488 | EP1335563 | US20060169149 |