EP2330464 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0031 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INNO, Toshifumi Fujifilm Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09816112.8 | 17.09.2009 | [2011/23] | WO2009JP66305 | Priority number, date | JP20080244452 | 24.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008244452 | JP20090018511 | 29.01.2009 Original published format: JP 2009018511 | [2011/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010035697 | Date: | 01.04.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2330464 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/32, G03F7/00, G03F7/029, G03F7/032, G03F7/11, G03F7/30, G03F7/031, G03F7/033, G03F7/09 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
G03F7/322 (EP,US);
G03F7/031 (EP,US);
G03F7/032 (EP,US);
G03F7/033 (EP,US);
G03F7/0388 (EP,US);
G03F7/092 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/23] | G03F7/32, G03F7/00, G03F7/029, G03F7/032, G03F7/11, G03F7/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER LITHOGRAFIEPLATTE | [2011/23] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE | [2011/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE PLAQUE D'IMPRESSION LITHOGRAPHIQUE | [2011/23] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2011 | Translation filed | 21.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 11.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/11] | 17.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2159640 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [E] 1-12 * paragraphs [0083] - [0089] - [0343]; claims 1-15 *; | [XP]EP2045662 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-12 * paragraphs [0109] - [0128] - [0204] , [0373] - [0392]; claims 1-19 *; | [X]EP1767352 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0242] - [0263]; claims 1-7 *; | [X]EP1892572 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0017] - [0025] - [0241] , [0258] , [0297] - [0314]; claims 1-9 *; | [Y]EP1829681 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0011] , [0059] - [0060] - [0228] , [0308]; claims 1-11 *; | [Y]EP1602982 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0014] , [0033] , [0036] , [0071] - [0079] * | International search | [X]JPH1062978 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [X]JPH1039499 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [Y]JPH1165126 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [Y]JP2007171754 (KONICA MINOLTA MED & GRAPHIC); | [A]JPH04287046 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [A]JP2001125281 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH1165126 | EP1868036 | JP2007538279 | JP4537377B | JP4486516B | JP2007171406 | JP2007206216 | JP2007206217 | JP2007225701 | JP2007225702 | JP2007316582 | JP2007328243 | JPS5147334B | JPS57196231 | JPS595240 | JPS59524 | JPH02226149 | JPH01165613 | JPS5421726B | JPS4841708B | JPS5137193 | JPH0232293B | JPH0216765B | JPS5849860B | JPS5617654B | JPS6239417B | JPS6239418B | JPS63277653 | JPS63260909 | JPH01105238 | JPS4864183 | JPS4943191B | JPS5230490B | JPS4643946B | JPH0140337B | JPH0140336B | JPH0225493 | JPS6122048 | JP2007058170 | JP2001133969 | EP1369232 | EP1369231 | EP1341040 | US2003124460 | EP1241002 | EP1288720 | US6027857 | US6171735 | US6420089 | JP2001277740 | JP2001277742 | US2800457 | US2800458 | US3287154 | JP3819574B | JPS402446B | US3418250 | US3660304 | US3796669 | US3914511 | US4001140 | US4087376 | US4089802 | US4025445 | JPS3069163B | JPS519079B | GB930422 | US3111407 | GB952807 | GB967074 | US3458311 | JPS5549729B | EP0352630 | JPS5463902 | JP2001253181 | JP2001322365 | US2714066 | US3181461 | US3280734 | US3902734 | JP3622063B | US3276868 | US4153461 | US4689272 | JP2001199175 | JP2002079772 | JPH10282679 | JPH02304441 | JPH0721633B | JPH0545885 | JPH0635174 | JPH02220061 | JPS6059351 | US5148746 | US5568768 | GB2297719 | JPS58159533 | JPH03100554 | JP2000089478 | JP2008244452 | JP2009001851 | - NIPPON SECCHAKU KYOKAISHI, (1984), vol. 20, no. 7, pages 300 - 308 |