EP2351907 - FLUID MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanden Corporation 20 Kotobuki-chou Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | [2011/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASUYA Junichirou c/o SANDEN CORPORATION 20 Kotobuki-chou Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA Shinji c/o SANDEN CORPORATION 20 Kotobuki-chou Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | 03 /
WADA Hirofumi c/o SANDEN CORPORATION 20 Kotobuki-chou Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | [2011/31] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09816302.5 | 24.09.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009JP67133 | Priority number, date | JP20080244228 | 24.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008244228 | [2011/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010035891 | Date: | 01.04.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2351907 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01C21/18, F01C1/02, F01C13/04, F04C23/02, F04C29/12, F01K25/08 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
F04C29/12 (EP,US);
F01K23/06 (EP,US);
F04C18/0207 (EP,US);
F04C23/006 (EP,US);
F04C29/04 (EP,US);
F04C2250/102 (EP,US);
F04C23/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/31] | F01C21/18, F01C1/02, F01C13/04, F04C23/02, F04C29/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Title | German: | STRÖMUNGSMASCHINE | [2011/31] | English: | FLUID MACHINE | [2011/31] | French: | MACHINE DE FLUIDE | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2011 | Translation filed | 11.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 21.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/04] | 03.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2013617 (HELIX DEVICES LTD) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]US4357800 (HECKER WALTER G) [X] 1-4 * column 1 - column 2; figures 1,2 * * column 4, line 8 - line 30 *; | [A]US4366674 (EAKMAN LARRY A) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]US5758501 (JIRNOV OLGA [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 1 - column 3; figure 1 *; | [A]JP2003314464 (ANEST IWATA CORP) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1422378 (TEXAS A & M UNIV SYS [US]) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [A]JP2004346759 (SANDEN CORP) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005235670 (TAKEUCHI YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007237665 (HOLTZAPPLE MARK T [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0178] - paragraph [0182]; figures 1,2,70A * | International search | [Y]JP2003139059 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [Y]JP2006266238 (DENSO CORP, et al); | [A]JP2008508463 (AGAM ENERGY SYSTEMS LTD.); | [Y]JP2008163931 (TERATEKKU KK); | [Y]US2008264062 (PRUEITT MELVIN L [US]); | [YE]JP2009270559 (TERATEKKU KK) | by applicant | JP2006266238 |