EP2343350 - SYSTEM FOR RECYCLING USED TIRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jeon, Yeong Min 107-405 HwangsilTown Apt. Wolpyeong 3(sam)-dong Seo-gu Daejeon 302-792 / KR | [2011/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/28] | Representative(s) | Pulieri, Gianluca Antonio Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | Pulieri, Gianluca Antonio Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | Application number, filing date | 09816353.8 | 28.08.2009 | [2011/28] | WO2009KR04838 | Priority number, date | KR20080093763 | 24.09.2008 Original published format: KR 20080093763 | [2011/28] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010035960 | Date: | 01.04.2010 | Language: | KO | [2010/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2343350 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C10G1/10, C08J11/12, B29B17/00 | [2011/28] | CPC: |
C08J11/12 (EP,KR,US);
C10G1/10 (EP,KR,US);
B29B17/00 (EP,KR,US);
C10B49/04 (EP,US);
C10B53/07 (EP,US);
B29B2017/0496 (EP,US);
B29L2030/00 (EP,US);
C08J2319/00 (EP,US);
C08J2321/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/28] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR WIEDERVERWERTUNG ALTER REIFEN | [2011/28] | English: | SYSTEM FOR RECYCLING USED TIRES | [2011/28] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR RECYCLER DES PNEUMATIQUES USAGÉS | [2011/28] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2011 | Translation filed | 22.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 12.12.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1785248 (KRIVORUCHKO EVGENY PETROVICH [RU]) [A] 1-6* figure 1 *; | [XAI] - SINN H ET AL, "PROCESSING OF PLASTIC WASTE AND SCRAP TIRES INTO CHEMICAL RAW MATERIALS, ESPECIALY BY PYROLYSIS", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE. INTERNATIONAL EDITION, WILEY VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, (19760101), vol. 15, no. 11, doi:10.1002/ANIE.197606601, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 660 - 672, XP001048759 [X] 1,2,4 * figure 13 * [A] 3 [I] 5,6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.197606601 | [A] - KAMINSKY W, "RECYCLING OF POLYMERIC MATERIALS BY PYROLYSIS", MAKROMOLEKULARE CHEMIE, MACROMOLECULAR SYMPOSIA, HUTHIG UND WEPF VERLAG. BASEL, CH, (19910801), vol. 48 / 49, pages 381 - 393, XP000233398 [A] 1-6 * figure 1 * | International search | [Y]KR0155064B (LEE HYUN HEE [KR]); | [Y]WO0011110 (ERSHAG BENGT STURE [SE]); | [A]KR100610528B (KIM LEE DONG MYUNG [ES], et al); | [Y]KR100628890B (ACE CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | KR100628890B |