EP2341637 - METHOD AND USER TERMINAL FOR DETERMINING ASSOCIATED PARAMETERS, AND METHOD AND BASE STATION FOR FORMING SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Mobile Communications Corporation 29, Jinrong Ave. Xicheng District Beijing 100032 / CN | [2011/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Guangyi 29 Jinrong Ave. Xicheng District Beijing 100032 / CN | 02 /
HAN, Lu 29 Jinrong Ave. Xicheng District Beijing 100032 / CN | 03 /
SHEN, Xiaodong 29 Jinrong Ave. Xicheng District Beijing 100032 / CN | 04 /
JIANG, Dajie 29 Jinrong Ave. Xicheng District Beijing 100032 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Qixing 29 Jinrong Ave. Xicheng District Beijing 100032 / CN | 06 /
ZHANG, Yong 29 Jinrong Ave. Xicheng District Beijing 100032 / CN | [2011/27] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/27] | Kling, Simone Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 85a 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09817190.3 | 25.11.2009 | [2011/27] | WO2009CN01319 | Priority number, date | CN200810223005 | 25.09.2008 Original published format: CN200810223005 | [2011/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010037276 | Date: | 08.04.2010 | Language: | ZH | [2010/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2341637 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/005, H04B7/04, H04B7/06, H04L1/00, H04L1/20 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
H04B7/0617 (EP);
H04B7/0417 (EP);
H04L1/0003 (EP);
H04L1/0009 (EP);
H04L1/20 (EP);
H04B7/0632 (EP);
H04L1/0025 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/27] | H04B7/005 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND BENUTZERENDGERÄT ZUR BESTIMMUNG RELEVANTER PARAMETER SOWIE VERFAHREN UND BASISSTATION ZUR SIGNALERZEUGUNG | [2011/27] | English: | METHOD AND USER TERMINAL FOR DETERMINING ASSOCIATED PARAMETERS, AND METHOD AND BASE STATION FOR FORMING SIGNAL | [2011/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET TERMINAL UTILISATEUR UTILISÉS POUR DÉTERMINER DES PARAMÈTRES ASSOCIÉS, PROCÉDÉ ET STATION DE BASE UTILISÉS POUR FORMER LE SIGNAL | [2011/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2011 | Translation filed | 30.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/27] | 04.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.11.2018 | 15.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/14] | 26.11.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1353452 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-28 * abstract ** paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0011] , [0018] , [0019] , [0035] , [0036] , [0039] - [0045] - [0060] - [0063] *; | [IA]US2004184398 (WALTON JAY ROD [US], et al) [I] 1,2,5,6,9,14,19-23,26-28 * abstract * * figures 3,4,5A,5B,6 * * paragraphs [0004] - [0015] - [0034] , [0035] , [0042] , [0045] - [0065] - [0071] , [0072] , [0095] - [0107] - [0114] * * paragraphs [0134] - [0153] - [0170] - [0186] * [A] 3,4,7,8,10-13,15-18,24,25; | [I]EP1492294 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [I] 1,2,5,6,9,14,19,20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0010] - [0016] - [0023] - [0025] *; | [I]US2005157776 (RYU KIL-HYEN [KR]) [I] 1,5,9,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0010] - [0026] , [0032] , [0040] - [0054] * | International search | [A]US2003128160 (SIM DONG-HI [KR]); | [A]EP1439526 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]CN1658526 (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO [CN]); | [A]CN1739270 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [A]CN1266856C (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) | Examination | - "3rd Generation Partnership Project;Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network;Tx diversity solutions for multiple antennas (Release 6)", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-040396 (TR25869V121)_R1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20040301), vol. RAN WG1, no. Malaga, Spain; 20040301, XP050098705 |