EP2336403 - FIBER, CLOTH, AND UNDERWEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gunze Limited 1, Zeze Aono-cho Ayabe-shi, Kyoto 623-8511 / JP | [2011/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAI Koichi c/o GUNZE LIMITED Research Laboratory 163 Morikawaracho Moriyama-shi Shiga 524-8501 / JP | 02 /
SUETO Soichi c/o GUNZE LIMITED Research Laboratory 163 Morikawaracho Moriyama-shi Shiga 524-8501 / JP | 03 /
KURODA Koji c/o GUNZE LIMITED Research Laboratory 163 Morikawaracho Moriyama-shi Shiga 524-8501 / JP | [2013/35] |
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
NAKAI Koichi c/o GUNZE LIMITED Research Laboratory 163 Morikawaracho Moriyama-shi Shiga 524-8501 / JP | ||
02 /
SUETO Soichi c/o GUNZE LIMITED Research Laboratory 163 Morikawaracho Moriyama-shi Shiga 524-8501 / JP | |||
03 /
KURODA Koji c/o GUNZE LIMITED Research Laboratory 163 Morikawaracho Moriyama-shi Shiga 524-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/25] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09817668.8 | 18.09.2009 | [2011/25] | WO2009JP66368 | Priority number, date | JP20080254662 | 30.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008254662 | JP20080296784 | 20.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008296784 | [2011/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010038632 | Date: | 08.04.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2336403 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2336403 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/90, A41B17/00, D01F1/10, D01F6/82 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
D01F1/10 (EP,KR,US);
D01F6/90 (EP,KR,US);
A41B17/00 (KR);
D01F6/82 (EP,US);
D01F8/12 (EP);
D03D15/292 (KR);
D04B1/16 (KR);
A41B2500/00 (EP,US);
D10B2401/041 (KR);
D10B2501/00 (KR);
Y10T442/30 (EP,US);
Y10T442/40 (EP,US);
Y10T442/60 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/25] | D01F6/90, A41B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FASER, STOFF UND UNTERBEKLEIDUNG DARAUS | [2011/25] | English: | FIBER, CLOTH, AND UNDERWEAR | [2011/25] | French: | FIBRE, TISSU, ET SOUS-VÊTEMENT | [2011/25] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2011 | Translation filed | 18.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 18.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2009 | AT | 28.08.2013 | BE | 28.08.2013 | BG | 28.08.2013 | CY | 28.08.2013 | CZ | 28.08.2013 | DK | 28.08.2013 | EE | 28.08.2013 | ES | 28.08.2013 | FI | 28.08.2013 | HR | 28.08.2013 | IT | 28.08.2013 | LT | 28.08.2013 | LV | 28.08.2013 | MC | 28.08.2013 | MK | 28.08.2013 | MT | 28.08.2013 | NL | 28.08.2013 | PL | 28.08.2013 | RO | 28.08.2013 | SE | 28.08.2013 | SI | 28.08.2013 | SK | 28.08.2013 | SM | 28.08.2013 | TR | 28.08.2013 | IE | 18.09.2013 | LU | 18.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | FR | 28.10.2013 | GB | 28.11.2013 | NO | 28.11.2013 | GR | 29.11.2013 | IS | 28.12.2013 | PT | 30.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MK | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
TR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 28.10.2013 | ||
GB | 28.11.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 28.10.2013 | ||
GB | 28.11.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 28.10.2013 | ||
GB | 28.11.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 28.08.2013 | |
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 28.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02055768 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1873282 (GUNZE KK [JP]) [A] 1-5* the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH02175918 (KANEBO LTD); | [A]JPH05171569 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]JPH05214670 (TEIJIN LTD); | [Y]JPH0616929 (KANEBO LTD); | [Y]JP2004270075 (GUNZE KK) | by applicant | JPH01229810 | JP2004270075 | JP2005036361 | JP3757446B |