EP2342064 - FILM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0031 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEGAMI, Ryuta c/o FUJIFILM CORPORATION 210 Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-0193 / JP | [2011/28] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09817932.8 | 01.10.2009 | [2011/28] | WO2009JP67523 | Priority number, date | JP20080256559 | 01.10.2008 Original published format: JP 2008256559 | [2011/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010038907 | Date: | 08.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2342064 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/88, C08J5/18 | [2011/28] | CPC: |
B29C48/495 (EP,US);
B29C48/49 (KR);
B29C48/08 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/21 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/251 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/2556 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/307 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/31 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/914 (EP,KR,US);
C08G63/183 (KR,US);
C08G63/189 (KR,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/07 (EP,US);
C08J2367/02 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/24355 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/28] | Title | German: | FILM UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DEN FILM | [2011/28] | English: | FILM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING FILM | [2011/28] | French: | FILM ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN FILM | [2011/28] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 11.02.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0247031 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JPH06335966 (KANEBO LTD); | [A]JPH09155951 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001347565 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]WO0222343 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]JP2002292665 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [Y]JP2005193643 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [X]JP2007002216 (FUJIFILM HOLDINGS CORP); | [X]JP2008044336 (KONICA MINOLTA OPTO INC); | [Y]JP2008095085 (TOYO BOSEKI) |