EP2344152 - ORAL VACCINES FOR PRODUCING MUCOSAL IMMUNITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immune Solutions Limited Centre For Innovation 87 St. David Street University Of Otago Dunedin 9054 / NZ | [2011/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALDWELL, Frank, E. 80B London Street Dunedin / NZ | 02 /
BEAGLEY, Kenneth, W. Callaghan NSW 2308 / AU | [2011/29] | Representative(s) | Care, Alison, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Care, Alison, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/29] | Care, Alison Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09818862.6 | 07.10.2009 | [2011/29] | WO2009IB07232 | Priority number, date | US20080195631P | 08.10.2008 Original published format: US 195631 P | US20080195882P | 10.10.2008 Original published format: US 195882 P | [2011/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010041143 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2344152 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/20, A61P37/00, A61K39/118, A61K39/02, A61P31/04 | [2011/29] | CPC: |
A61K31/20 (KR);
A61K39/02 (KR);
A61K39/105 (EP,US);
A61K39/118 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61K2039/542 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/29] | Title | German: | ORALE IMPFSTOFFE FÜR SCHLEIMHAUTIMMUNITÄT | [2011/29] | English: | ORAL VACCINES FOR PRODUCING MUCOSAL IMMUNITY | [2011/29] | French: | VACCINS ORAUX POUR PRODUIRE UNE IMMUNITE MUCOSALE | [2011/29] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 02.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 08.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO02062380 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOG [BE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-29 *; | [Y]WO9824475 (ASTRA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-8,10-15 * claims 1-99 *; | [Y]WO03009868 (UNIV OTAGO [NZ], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9822135 (ASTRA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-8,10-15 * abstract * | [XP] - HICKEY DANICA K ET AL, "Transcutaneous immunization with a novel lipid-based adjuvant protects against Chlamydia genital and respiratory infections", VACCINE, (200910), vol. 27, no. 44, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 6217 - 6225, XP002692146 [XP] 1 * abstract * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.VACCINE.2009.08.001 | International search | [Y]US2004234533 (ALDWELL FRANK ERNEST [NZ], et al); | [Y]US2003219453 (MAISONNEUVE JEAN-FRANCOIS LUCI [US], et al); | [Y]WO9822135 (ASTRA AB [SE], et al); | [Y]US2006008519 (DAVIDSEN JESPER [DK], et al); | [A]US2004024058 (YAMADA HARUKI [JP], et al); | [A]WO0041682 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al); | [A]US2003099659 (GIZURARSON SVEINBJORN [IS], et al); | [A]US7399472 (FRIEDE MARTIN [GB], et al) |